Woodlawn Community Development Corp. v. Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors et al
Appellant: Woodlawn Community Development Corp.
Appellee: Gina B. Krol and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Case Number: 1:2019cv07789
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS held on 11/14/19 regarding Notice of Appeal #4 . (To view an image of this document please visit the Bankruptcy Court docket.) (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(USBC-Ross, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Plaintiff-Appellant's motion for extension of time in which Appellant may file their brief from 1/9/2020, to and including 2/6/2020 #6 is granted. Motion hearing noticed for 1/9/2020 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (is, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by David R. Herzog for presentment of extension of time #6 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 1/9/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Herzog, David)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Appellant Woodlawn Community Development Corp. for extension of time to file Plaintiff-Appellant's Brief (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herzog, David)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 TRANSCRIPT OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS held on 8/28/2019 regarding Notice of Appeal #4 . (To view an image of this document please visit the Bankruptcy Court docket.) (USBC-Rivera, )
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Appellant/Appellee Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(USBC-Rivera, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors by Jeffrey Chad Dan (Dan, Jeffrey)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 BK Rule 8010) (lma, )
November 26, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lw, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 18 B 29862 (Judge Doyle) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit)(USBC-Ross, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodlawn Community Development Corp. v. Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Woodlawn Community Development Corp.
Represented By: David R. Herzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gina B. Krol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: Arthur Gary Simon
Represented By: Jeffrey Chad Dan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?