United States of America v. Dobias
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Paul J. Dobias
Case Number: 1:2019cv07794
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Tax Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 10 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Jones, Samuel)
January 23, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On the Court's own initiative, the hearing of 01/31/2020 is reset to 01/30/2020 at 9:30 a.m. The joint initial status report is due by 01/28/2020. Mailed notice (mw, )
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of the status report and the consent-judgment discussions described in the report, the status hearing of 01/06/2020 is reset to 01/31/2020 at 10:00 AM. But the parties must proceed promptly with negotiations, including prompt responses to each other's proposals, and Defendant is further warned that he will face a default judgment if the case is not promptly resolved.Emailed notice (eec)
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Jones, Samuel)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to Paul J. Dobias on 12/14/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Jones, Samuel)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Initial status hearing set for 01/06/2020 at 9 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases.Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
November 27, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Paul J. Dobias (ecw, )
November 26, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lw, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America by Samuel Patrick Jones (Jones, Samuel)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Jones, Samuel)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America; (Jones, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Dobias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul J. Dobias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Samuel Patrick Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?