Shekar et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Roger Shekar and Monica Shekar
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Mortgage, Altisource LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation and PHH Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv07812
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: On November 26, 2019, Attorney David P. Cutler of the Law Firm Cutler & Hull filed case number 19 C 7812, Shekar et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC et al on behalf of plaintiffs Roger Shekar and Monica Shekar. Because plaintiff Roger Shekar is listed as a restricted filer in this Court, an Executive Committee order was entered on December 9, 2019, dismissing the matter. On December 18, 2019, plaintiffs Roger Shekar and Monica Shekar submitted their Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate the Executive Committee Order Dated December 9, 2019. At its meeting on January 9, 2020, the Executive Committee considered the motion, therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED That case number 19 C 7812, Shekar et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC et al is reinstated nunc pro tune November 26, 2019 and directly assigned to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman, and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED That because Roger Shekar is a restricted filer, he is removed as a plaintiff, and the matter will proceed with plaintiff Monica Shekar only, and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED That this order shall be docketed on Civil Action No. 12 C 1698 as well as case number 19 C 7812, Shekar et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC et al. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/16/2020. (cc, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: On March 12, 2012, an Executive Committee order was entered, restricting the filings of Roger Shekar such that any documents he submits shall first be reviewed by the Executive Committee to determine whether they should be filed. On January 15, 2019, an Executive Committee order was entered, directing that Roger Shekar sign in upon arrival at the Dirksen U.S. Courthouse at 219 S. Dearborn Street, Chicago, Illinois, 60604 or at the Stanley J. Roszkowski U.S. Courthouse at 327 S. Church Street, Rockford, Illinois 61101, and be escorted by a representative of the U.S. Marshals Service at all times while he is present in the Dirksen U.S. Courthouse or in the Stanley J. Roszkowski U.S. Courthouse. On July 10, 2019, the Seventh Circuit entered a Mack order, directing that, "Unless and until Shekar pays all outstanding filing fees and sanctions, the clerks of all federal courts in this circuit are directed to return untiled any papers submitted either directly or indirectly by him or on his behalf. See In re City of Chi., 500 F.3d 582, 585-86 (7th Cir. 2007); Support Sys. Intl, Inc. v. Mack, 45 F.3d 185, 186 (7th Cir. 1995) (per curiam). In accordance with our decision in Mack, exceptions to this filing bar are made for criminal cases and for applications for writs of habeas corpus. See Mack, 45 F.3d at 186-87." On November 26, 2019, on behalf of Mr. Shekar, Attorney David P. Cutler of the law firm Cutler & Hull filed case number 19 C 7812, Shekar et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al. As prior orders issued to Mr. Shekar have indicated, any new complaints submitted by or on behalf of Mr. Shekar shall be reviewed by the Executive Committee to determine whether they should be filed. At its meeting on December 5, 2019, the Executive Committee reviewed the documents, therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Mr. Shekar is denied leave to file his documents filed on November 26, 2019, and case number 19 C 7812 is dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT a copy of this order shall be docketed in case number 19 C 7812. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the order entered on May 12, 2012 remains in force, and any documents submitted by Mr. Shekar shall be reviewed by the Executive Committee to determine whether they should be filed, and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the order entered on January 15, 2019 remains in force, and Roger Shekar shall sign in upon arrival at the Dirksen U.S. Courthouse or the Stanley J. Roszkowski U.S. Courthouse, and be escorted by a representative of the U.S. Marshals Service at all times while he is present in the Dirksen U.S. Courthouse or in the Stanley J. Roszkowski U.S. Courthouse. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT any new complaints filed by Mr. Shekar and transferred to this Court from another jurisdiction shall be reviewed by the Executive Committee to determine whether they should be filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the Clerk shall cause a copy of this order to be mailed to Mr. Shekar at CSA LTD., 950 Plumgrove, P.O. Box 681085, Schaumburg, Illinois 60168-1085, the address given by Mr. Shekar in documents received on November 25, 2019. Such mailing shall be by certified or registered mail, return receipt requested. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/9/2019. Mailed certified notice bearing tracking no. 7019 2280 0000 0963 0715. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/9/2019. (cc, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Monica Shekar, Roger Shekar by David P. Cutler (Cutler, David)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Cutler, David)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Roger Shekar; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit)(Cutler, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shekar et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altisource LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Shekar
Represented By: David P. Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Shekar
Represented By: David P. Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?