Schneider v. Reliastar Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kirsten Schneider
Defendant: Reliastar Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv07820
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 2/14/2020. The Court will hold a status hearing on 2/21/2020 at 10:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kirsten Schneider. Reliastar Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 12/6/2019, answer due 2/4/2020. (Kemmitt, Michael)
December 6, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant ReliaStar Life Insurance Company (yt)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Michael Kemmitt's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff #4 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 12/2/2019. Mailed notice (aee, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16487625. (Kemmitt, Michael)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kristen Schneider by Meredith Emily Marcus (Marcus, Meredith)
November 27, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marcus, Meredith)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kristen Schneider; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16482453. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marcus, Meredith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schneider v. Reliastar Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliastar Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirsten Schneider
Represented By: Meredith Emily Marcus
Represented By: Michael John Kemmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?