H.C. Schmieding Produce Co., LLC v. Lurie Brothers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: H.C. Schmieding Produce Co., LLC
Defendant: Frank J. Cione, Lurie Brothers, LLC, John D. Dernis, Salvatore J. Cimino, Jr. and Alex D. Dernis
Case Number: 1:2019cv07933
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Frank J. Cione(Golding, Jonathan)
January 2, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Frank J. Cione by Jonathan David Golding (Golding, Jonathan)
January 2, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Frank J. Cione by Richard N Golding (Golding, Richard)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by H.C. Schmieding Produce Co., LLC as to Lurie Brothers, LLC on 12/14/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Kohn, William)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by H.C. Schmieding Produce Co., LLC as to John D. Dernis on 12/14/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Kohn, William)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by H.C. Schmieding Produce Co., LLC as to Salvatore J. Cimino, Jr. on 12/14/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Kohn, William)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by H.C. Schmieding Produce Co., LLC as to Frank J. Cione on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Kohn, William)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 4/29/2020 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) planning report re MIDP due 4/24/2020. The report must comply with the requirements of the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg)
December 5, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Salvatore J. Cimino, Jr., Frank J. Cione, Alex D. Dernis, John D. Dernis, Lurie Brothers, LLC (kl, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H.C. Schmieding Produce Co., LLC by William Briskin Kohn as Local Counsel (Kohn, William)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by H.C. Schmieding Produce Co., LLC (Fassett, Mary)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff H.C. Schmieding Produce Co., LLC by Mary Jean Fassett (Fassett, Mary)
December 4, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jg, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fassett, Mary)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Enforce Payment from Produce Trust filed by H.C. Schmieding Produce Co., LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16495861.(Fassett, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H.C. Schmieding Produce Co., LLC v. Lurie Brothers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank J. Cione
Represented By: Richard N Golding
Represented By: Jonathan David Golding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lurie Brothers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Dernis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvatore J. Cimino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex D. Dernis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.C. Schmieding Produce Co., LLC
Represented By: Mary Jean Fassett
Represented By: William Briskin Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?