Mesenbring v. Rollins, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Mesenbring, Cadence Jo Mesenbring and Jackson Michael Mesenbring
Defendant: Rollins, Inc. and The Industrial Fumigant Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv08013
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Christopher Cremin, Jr for presentment of extension of time #24 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 2/6/2020 at 01:45 PM. (Cremin, Patrick)
January 31, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION by Defendants Rollins, Inc., The Industrial Fumigant Company, LLC for extension of time to file Initial Discovery Responses and to Issue Written Discovery (AGREED) (Cremin, Patrick)
December 23, 2019 Filing 23 AMENDED Notice of Removal by Defendants (Cremin, Patrick)
December 19, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Motion hearing held on 12/19/2019. Motion to remand #15 is denied as moot in light of amended notice of removal. Motion for leave to file an amended notice of removal #20 is granted. Discovery schedule: MIDP are due by 1/31/20; written discovery to issue by 2/14/20; final supplementation of MIDP is due by 8/31/20; fact discovery closes on 9/30/20. Status hearing set for 2/6/20 is stricken. Next status date set for 4/30/20 at 1:30 PM to report on discovery and settlement. Mailed notice (rj, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Christopher Cremin, Jr for presentment of motion for leave to file #20 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 12/19/2019 at 01:45 PM. (Cremin, Patrick)
December 19, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendants Rollins, Inc., The Industrial Fumigant Company, LLC for leave to file Amended Notice of Removal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1653 and Memorandum in Support Thereof (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cremin, Patrick)
December 13, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by All Defendants re answer to complaint #17 , answer to complaint #18 of Filing (Hunt, Brian)
December 13, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by The Industrial Fumigant Company, LLC(Hunt, Brian)
December 13, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Rollins, Inc.(Hunt, Brian)
December 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Cornelius Edward McKnight for presentment of motion to remand #15 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 12/19/2019 at 01:45 PM. (McKnight, Cornelius)
December 13, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiffs Cadence Jo Mesenbring, Jackson Michael Mesenbring, Melissa Mesenbring to remand (McKnight, Cornelius)
December 13, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cadence Jo Mesenbring, Jackson Michael Mesenbring, Melissa Mesenbring by Joanne M Krol (Krol, Joanne)
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cadence Jo Mesenbring, Jackson Michael Mesenbring, Melissa Mesenbring by Nathan Pear Karlsgodt (Karlsgodt, Nathan)
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cadence Jo Mesenbring, Jackson Michael Mesenbring, Melissa Mesenbring by Stanley A. Kitzinger (Kitzinger, Stanley)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cadence Jo Mesenbring, Jackson Michael Mesenbring, Melissa Mesenbring by Cornelius Edward McKnight (McKnight, Cornelius)
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by The Industrial Fumigant Company, LLC(Hunt, Brian)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 2/6/2020 at 1:30 PM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 1/30/2020. Mailed notice (rj, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 MAILED Rule 83.15 letter to counsel of record (las, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, )
December 6, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by All Defendants of Filing Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, Brian Hunt Appearance, Corporate Disclosures of Rollins, Inc. and The Industrial Fumigant Company, LLC (Hunt, Brian)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Rollins, Inc. (pursuant to FRCP 7.1) (Hunt, Brian)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Industrial Fumigant Company, LLC (Hunt, Brian)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Rollins, Inc., The Industrial Fumigant Company, LLC by Brian James Hunt (Hunt, Brian)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hunt, Brian)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2019 L 011685) filed by Rollins, Inc., The Industrial Fumigant Company, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16507751. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Hunt, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mesenbring v. Rollins, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Mesenbring
Represented By: Stanley A. Kitzinger
Represented By: Cornelius Edward McKnight
Represented By: Joanne M Krol
Represented By: Nathan Pear Karlsgodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cadence Jo Mesenbring
Represented By: Stanley A. Kitzinger
Represented By: Cornelius Edward McKnight
Represented By: Joanne M Krol
Represented By: Nathan Pear Karlsgodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson Michael Mesenbring
Represented By: Stanley A. Kitzinger
Represented By: Cornelius Edward McKnight
Represented By: Joanne M Krol
Represented By: Nathan Pear Karlsgodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rollins, Inc.
Represented By: Brian James Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Industrial Fumigant Company, LLC
Represented By: Brian James Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?