Malek v. Malek
Plaintiff: Nancy Malek
Defendant: Marc Malek
Case Number: 1:2019cv08076
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Marc Malek by William Paul Ziegelmueller (Ziegelmueller, William)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nancy Malek as to Marc Malek on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020. (Sneeringer, Stanley)
January 7, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Marc Malek (jg, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 2/18/20 at 9:30 a.m. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nancy Malek by Matthew D Wilson (Wilson, Matthew)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nancy Malek by Stanley Carlylle Sneeringer (Sneeringer, Stanley)
December 10, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sneeringer, Stanley)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AT LAW filed by Nancy Malek; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16517847.(Sneeringer, Stanley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malek v. Malek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Malek
Represented By: William Paul Ziegelmueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Malek
Represented By: Stanley Carlylle Sneeringer
Represented By: Matthew D Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?