Canyon Z, LLC et al v. PNW Healthcare Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CANYON NH, LLC and CANYON Z, LLC
Defendant: PNW HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT, LLC and Dov Jacobs
Case Number: 1:2019cv08111
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 39 REPLY by Dov Jacobs, PNW Healthcare Management, LLC to MOTION by Defendants Dov Jacobs, PNW Healthcare Management, LLC to stay #34 , memorandum in opposition to motion #37 (Klein, Mayer)
September 12, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION by Plaintiffs Canyon Z, LLC, Canyon NH, LLC for summary judgment (Attachments: #1 L.R. 56.1 Statement of Facts, #2 Exhibit, #3 Memorandum of Law ISO Motion for Summary Judgment)(Finger, Kevin)
September 11, 2020 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM by Canyon NH, LLC, Canyon Z, LLC in Opposition to motion to stay #34 (Finger, Kevin)
August 28, 2020 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Response to motion to stay #34 is to be filed by 9/11/2020. Reply to response is to be filed by 9/18/2020. (mk)
August 27, 2020 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM by Dov Jacobs, PNW Healthcare Management, LLC in support of motion to stay #34 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A)(Klein, Mayer)
August 27, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION by Defendants Dov Jacobs, PNW Healthcare Management, LLC to stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Klein, Mayer)
August 21, 2020 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic status hearing held on 8/21/2020. Defendant has until 8/31/2020 to serve written discovery requests to the plaintiff. A telephonic status hearing is set for 10/1/2020 at 9:00 a.m. The following call-in number will be used: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. By no later than 9/24/2020, the parties are to file a joint status report detailing the status of discovery, including the dates for all depositions. Mailed notice. (mma, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 32 STATUS Report - Joint by Canyon NH, LLC, Canyon Z, LLC (Finger, Kevin)
August 17, 2020 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, the telephone status hearing set for 10:30 AM on 8/21/2020 is advanced to 10:25 AM on that date, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. The Court notes that the parties failed to file a status report by 8/14/2020, as ordered by the Court on 7/16/2020 (dkt. no 30). The parties are to immediately confer and get a status report on file in conformity with that order by no later than the close of business on 8/19/2020. (mk)
July 16, 2020 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic status hearing held on 7/16/2020 and continued to 8/21/2020 at 10:30 a.m. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. By no later than 8/14/2020, the parties are to file a joint status report stating the names of the individuals that will be deposed and a schedule for the depositions. Mailed notice. (mma, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk7, Docket)
July 9, 2020 Filing 28 STATUS Report - Joint by Canyon NH, LLC, Canyon Z, LLC (Finger, Kevin)
June 14, 2020 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, the status hearing set for 6/18/2020 is vacated and reset to 7/16/2020 at 9:50 AM and will be conducted by telephone using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. A joint status report is to be filed by 7/8/2020, including the identity of all persons whose depositions the parties anticipate taking, as well as agreed upon dates or date ranges for each. The parties should assume that depositions will be to be taken by remote means and should plan accordingly. (mk)
May 30, 2020 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiffs' motion to extend the deadline to respond to written discovery to 6/27/2020 is granted #23 . (mk)
May 28, 2020 Filing 25 STATUS Report (Joint) by Canyon NH, LLC, Canyon Z, LLC (Finger, Kevin)
May 28, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE by Canyon NH, LLC, Canyon Z, LLC to MOTION to Defer Initial Discovery Response Deadline (MIDP) , filed by Defendants Dov Jacobs, PNW Healthcare Management, LLC. #23 (Finger, Kevin)
May 28, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Defer Initial Discovery Response Deadline (MIDP) , filed by Defendants Dov Jacobs, PNW Healthcare Management, LLC. (Hamburg, Steven)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket8, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket7, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint status report. At the Court's instance, and pursuant to Second Amended General Order 20-0012, the status hearing set for 4/28/2020 is vacated and reset to 6/18/2020 at 9:30 AM. By 5/28/2020, the parties are to file a further joint status report regarding the progress of discovery, as well as any other matter that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. Court expects them to make substantial progress with discovery prior to that time. This filing deadline is not affected by Second Amended General Order 20-0012, and it will not be affected by any similar general order entered hereafter. (mk)
April 23, 2020 Filing 19 STATUS Report - Joint by Canyon NH, LLC, Canyon Z, LLC (Finger, Kevin)
April 22, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The parties failed to file a joint status report by 4/21/2020, as ordered by the Court on 3/24/2020 (dkt. no. 16). They are directed to comply with the Court's 3/24/2020 order by no later than the close of business on 4/23/2020. (mk)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket13, )
March 24, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, and pursuant to General Order 20-0012, as amended, the status hearing set for 3/31/2020 is vacated and reset to 4/28/2020 at 9:15 AM. By no later than 4/21/2020, the parties are to file a joint status report describing in detail: (1) the status of discovery, including what has been done to date and what remains to be done; (2) the status of any discussions regarding settlement; and (3) any other matters the parties wish to bring to the Court's attention. This deadline will not be affected by General Order 20-0012 or any other similar general order hereafter entered. (mk)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 9, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Canyon NH, LLC, Canyon Z, LLC by Danny Duerdoth (Duerdoth, Danny)
February 10, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to amended complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Dov Jacobs, PNW Healthcare Management, LLC(Klein, Mayer)
January 29, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held on 1/29/2020. Attorney Mayer Klein's motion to appear pro hac vice #11 is granted. Defendant's answer to the amended complaint is due 2/10/2020. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures are due 2/10/2020. Written discovery is to be completed by 6/30/2020. Deadline for filing an amended complaint and adding parties is 8/31/2020. Fact discovery is due 10/31/2020. Telephone status hearing, to be initiated by the parties, is set for 3/31/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (mma, )
January 28, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16662557. (Klein, Mayer)
January 27, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, the status hearing set for 1/29/2020 is converted to a telephone status hearing at the time previously set. Counsel are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 746-1053. Counsel should be on the line at the time their status hearing is set to begin but should wait for their case to be called before identifying themselves, because attorneys in other cases will be calling into the same call-in number for statuses in their cases. Mailed notice. (mma, )
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED complaint by Canyon Z, LLC, Canyon NH, LLC against Dov Jacobs, PNW Healthcare Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Certificate of Service)(Finger, Kevin)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Dov Jacobs, PNW Healthcare Management, LLC by Steven M. Hamburg (Hamburg, Steven)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Dov Jacobs, PNW Healthcare Management, LLC(Hamburg, Steven)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 Entry of Appearance regarding ANSWER to Complaint by Dov Jacobs, PNW Healthcare Management, LLC(Hamburg, Steven)
January 5, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 1/29/2020 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant who has not yet appeared by counsel in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. (mk)
January 5, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The complaint in this case, which hwsa filed in federal court based on alleged diversity of citizenship, does not adequately allege the citizenship of any of the parties. The citizenship of an LLC (both plaintiffs and one of the defendants) is that of each of its members and must be traced all the way through any members that are themselves entities. See Mutual Assignment & Indemnification Co. v. Lind-Waldock & Co., LLC, 364 F.3d 858, 861 (7th Cir. 2004); Cosgrove v. Bartolotta, 150 F.3d 729, 731 (7th Cir. 1998). And with respect to the individual defendant, the complaint alleges only his state of residence, not his state of citizenship; the two are not necessarily the same. Plaintiff is given to 1/21/2020 to file an amended complaint that cures these defects. If plaintiff fails to do so, the Court will dismiss the case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (mk)
December 12, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Dov Jacobs(two separate addresses), PNW Healthcare Management, LLC (pj, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Canyon NH, LLC, Canyon Z, LLC by Kevin D. Finger (Finger, Kevin)
December 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by CANYON NH, LLC, CANYON Z, LLC (Finger, Kevin)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by CANYON Z, LLC, CANYON NH, LLC; Yes. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16522477. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Finger, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canyon Z, LLC et al v. PNW Healthcare Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CANYON NH, LLC
Represented By: Kevin D. Finger
Represented By: Danny Duerdoth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CANYON Z, LLC
Represented By: Kevin D. Finger
Represented By: Danny Duerdoth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNW HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Mayer Simcha Klein
Represented By: Steven M. Hamburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dov Jacobs
Represented By: Mayer Simcha Klein
Represented By: Steven M. Hamburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?