Carmello v. FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cedric Carmello
Defendant: FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv08115
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Based upon the filed Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal (Dckt. No. #21 ), this case is dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party. All pending deadlines and hearings are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal (Dravillas, Alexios)
January 27, 2020 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Motion hearing held on January 27, 2020. The Court discussed the status of service of process as to all defendants. The parties confirmed that all Defendants have been served or have waived service of process. Counsel reported to the Court that the parties may settle this matter. In light of that representation, and by agreement, the Court stays the briefing on Defendant's motion to dismiss (Dckt. No. #17 ). The Court basically will allow the parties to discuss settlement for a few weeks, without incurring potentially unnecessary litigation costs in the meantime. The Court encourages the parties to devote their time and resources toward exploring a potential early resolution. The parties will report on the status of settlement at the next status hearing. The Court stays Plaintiff's obligation to respond to the motion to dismiss (Dckt. No. #17 ) in the meantime. The status hearing previously set for February 13, 2020 (Dckt. No. #15 ) remains in place. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
January 17, 2020 MOTION by Defendant FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. to strike class action complaint. (Omitted Relief from Motion #17 .) (smm, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Joseph A. Strubbe for presentment of motion to dismiss #17 before Honorable Steven C. Seeger on 1/27/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Strubbe, Joseph)
January 17, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #17 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Strubbe, Joseph)
January 17, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. to dismiss or, Alternatively, to Strike Class Action Complaint (Strubbe, Joseph)
December 30, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Cedric Carmello regarding set deadlines/hearings,,,,,,, #15 (Zigler, Aaron)
December 27, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status hearing is set for February 13, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Report" on the Court's website. At least two weeks before the hearing, the parties must discuss settlement in good faith, and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. The parties also must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court before the initial status hearing. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) by February 10, 2020. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. Second, the parties must submit a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Please note that the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report on the Court's docket, but must email (i.e., not file on the docket) the proposed Scheduling Order to the Court's proposed order inbox. The initial status hearing will be the scheduling conference contemplated by Rule 16(b). Lead counsel for the parties must participate in the initial status conference. Counsel must be prepared to discuss the status of settlement, as well as the proposed discovery plan. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process by one week before the initial status hearing, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status hearing. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. (Strubbe, Joseph)
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The agreed motion for an extension of time (Dckt. No. #11 ) is granted. Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise plead by January 17, 2020. The motion hearing set for December 23, 2019 is hereby stricken. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Joseph A. Strubbe for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #11 before Honorable Steven C. Seeger on 12/23/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Strubbe, Joseph)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (AGREED) (Strubbe, Joseph)
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cedric Carmello by James Dominick Larry (Larry, James)
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED attorney appearance #8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cedric Carmello (Zigler, Aaron)
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cedric Carmello by Aaron M Zigler (Zigler, Aaron)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to all counsel of record. (smm, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
December 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. by Zachary J Watters (Watters, Zachary)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. by Frederic T. Knape (Knape, Frederic)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. by Joseph A. Strubbe (Strubbe, Joseph)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Strubbe, Joseph)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2019CH12997) filed by FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16522625. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Strubbe, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carmello v. FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Carmello
Represented By: James Dominick Larry
Represented By: Aaron M Zigler
Represented By: Alexios James Dravillas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A. Strubbe
Represented By: Frederic T. Knape
Represented By: Zachary J Watters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?