Shekar v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Monica Shekar and Pushpa
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC ("Ocwen"), PHH Mortgage, Ocwen Financial Corporation, PHH Mortgage Corporation d/b/a PHH Mortgage Services, Altisource, LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and PHH Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv08155
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendants Ocwen Financial Corporation, PHH Mortgage Corporation, and PHH Mortgage Corporation as Successor to Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #6 is granted. Defendants' responsive pleadings due by 3/6/2020. Motion presentment hearing set for 2/18/2020 is stricken. Mailed notice (cn).
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage, PHH Mortgage Corporation (Ocwen Defendants' Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Halberg, Caleb)
February 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Caleb J. Halberg for presentment of extension of time #6 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/18/2020 at 09:15 AM. (Halberg, Caleb)
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendants Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation for extension of time (Halberg, Caleb)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation by Caleb J. Halberg (Halberg, Caleb)
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Monica Shekar (Hull, Edwin)
January 3, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Altisource, LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation (ecw, )
December 13, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Monica Shekar; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit)(Cutler, David)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Monica Shekar by David P. Cutler (Cutler, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shekar v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC ("Ocwen")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Financial Corporation
Represented By: Caleb J. Halberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation d/b/a PHH Mortgage Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altisource, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Caleb J. Halberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Caleb J. Halberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Shekar
Represented By: David P. Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pushpa
Represented By: David P. Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?