Golbert v. Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital LLC et al
Plaintiff: Charles P. Golbert
Defendant: Richard Kasyoki, Beverly J. Walker, Beverly Mims, Neil Skene, Niama Malachi, George Sheldon, Shane Michaels, Dion Dill, Tausha Bluitt, Michael C. Jones, Elisabeth Schei, Andebola Majekodunmi, Tierney Stutz, Eve Brownstone, Marco Leonardo, Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital LLC, Denise Ellis, David Fletcher-Jazen, Brooke Sloan, Nikolay Katsarov and Signature Healthcare Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv08257
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Filing 126 MEMORANDUM by Denise Ellis, Michael C. Jones, Marco Leonardo, Beverly Mims, Neil Skene, Brooke Sloan, Tierney Stutz, Beverly J. Walker in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #125 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Certificate of Service)(Greenspan, Barbara)
June 26, 2020 Filing 125 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Denise Ellis, Michael C. Jones, Marco Leonardo, Beverly Mims, Neil Skene, Brooke Sloan, Tierney Stutz, Beverly J. Walker (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Certificate of Service)(Greenspan, Barbara)
June 26, 2020 Filing 124 MEMORANDUM by Tausha Bluitt in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion for more definite statement #123 (Kaminski, Matthew)
June 26, 2020 Filing 123 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Tausha Bluitt , MOTION by Defendant Tausha Bluittfor more definite statement (Kaminski, Matthew)
June 26, 2020 Filing 122 MEMORANDUM by Richard Kasyoki in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion for more definite statement #121 (Kaminski, Matthew)
June 26, 2020 Filing 121 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Richard Kasyoki , MOTION by Defendant Richard Kasyokifor more definite statement (Kaminski, Matthew)
June 25, 2020 Filing 120 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: The court has reviewed the joint status report. The court strikes the status set for 7/23/20. Defendants are correct that MIDP disclosures are not due until after Answers are filed. However, pending motions to dismiss is not a basis to stay discovery. FRCP 26(a) disclosures are due 8/28/20. Written discovery shall issue 9/25/20. Oral discovery can begin after rulings on the motions to dismiss. Mailed notice. (dm, )
June 24, 2020 Filing 119 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Charles P. Golbert (Drury, Scott)
June 22, 2020 Filing 118 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles P. Golbert as to Elisabeth Schei on 3/1/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Drury, Scott)
June 22, 2020 Filing 117 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Briefing schedule set in Docket 101 applies to the motions to dismiss recently filed by Michaels and Dill [Dkts. 112 and 114]. Mailed notice. (dm, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 116 Suggestion of a Representative for the Estate of George Sheldon by Beverly J. Walker (Greenspan, Barbara)
June 18, 2020 Filing 115 MEMORANDUM by Shane Michaels in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion for more definite statement #114 (Kaminski, Matthew)
June 18, 2020 Filing 114 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Shane Michaels , MOTION by Defendant Shane Michaelsfor more definite statement (Kaminski, Matthew)
June 17, 2020 Filing 113 MEMORANDUM by Dion Dill in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, motion for more definite statement #112 (Kaminski, Matthew)
June 17, 2020 Filing 112 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Dion Dill , MOTION by Defendant Dion Dillfor more definite statement (Kaminski, Matthew)
June 17, 2020 Filing 111 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendant Dion Dill's unopposed motion for leave to file responsive pleading instanter #110 is granted. Defendant shall file responsive pleading a separate entry on the docket. Mailed notice. (dm, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 110 MOTION by Defendant Dion Dill for leave to file Responsive Pleading Instanter (Unopposed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dion Dill's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), #2 Exhibit B - Dion Dill's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6))(Kaminski, Matthew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 109 Notice of Supplemental Information Regarding the Appointment and Substitution of a Special Representative for Deceased Defendant George Sheldon by Charles P. Golbert (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1, Declaration of Ethan Woodward, #2 Exhibit Exh A to Declaration)(Drury, Scott)
June 11, 2020 Filing 108 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendant Shane Michaels' motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to complaint #107 is granted. The deadline for defendant to answer or otherwise plead is extended to 6/19/20. Mailed notice. (dm, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 107 MOTION by Defendant Shane Michaels for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 or to otherwise plead (Koptik, Michael)
June 10, 2020 Filing 106 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shane Michaels by Matthew Edward Rechtoris (Rechtoris, Matthew)
June 10, 2020 Filing 105 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shane Michaels by Daria Ann Porta (Porta, Daria)
June 10, 2020 Filing 104 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shane Michaels by Matthew Kaminski (Kaminski, Matthew)
June 10, 2020 Filing 103 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shane Michaels by Michael Thomas Koptik (Koptik, Michael)
June 10, 2020 Filing 102 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shane Michaels by Michael E. Prangle (Prangle, Michael)
June 8, 2020 Filing 101 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Plaintiff's motion to file declaration in support of special representation motion #99 is granted. No appearance necessary on 7/16/20. Motion by Plaintiff to substitute party #44 is granted. Plaintiff has confirmed that no estate has been open for Mr. Sheldon. (Dkt. 99, Ex. A). The court directs Mr. Sheldon's heirs, elderly "siblings and nieces and nephews" according to the obituary, be notified after a special representative has been appointed who will defend the action on behalf of Mr. Sheldon. Counsel for Beverly Walker will be suggesting a personal representative of the Estate of George Sheldon. #92 . The Court will leave open the opportunity for Sheldon's heirs to object to the special representative. Counsel should identify that person to plaintiff's counsel by 6/19/20. Plaintiff shall notify Mr. Sheldon's heirs of the Complaint and the appointment of the personal representative within 21 days of the identification of that person. Certain defendants need to answer or otherwise plead and pending motions to dismiss require a revised briefing schedule. #83 Defendants Richard Kasyoki's and Tausha Bluitt's and Mr. Sheldon's responsive pleadings are due 6/26/20. This date incorporates the extensions allowed by the coronavirus general orders. Responses to Eve Brownstone, LCPC's motion to dismiss 40, Signature Healthcare Services, LLC and Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital, LLLC's motion to dismiss 64, David Fletcher-Janzen's motion to dismiss 77, Defendant Nikolay Katsarov's motion to dismiss 79, and Adebola Majekodunmi's motion to dismiss 81 and any motions to dismiss filed on 6/26/20 (Kasyoki, Bluitt or Sheldon) shall be filed by 7/31/20. Replies are due 8/14/20. Mailed notice. (dm, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 100 NOTICE of Motion by Mariah Esperanza Garcia for presentment of motion for leave to file #99 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 7/16/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Garcia, Mariah)
June 3, 2020 Filing 99 MOTION by Plaintiff Charles P. Golbert for leave to file Declaration in Support of Special Representative Motion (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Garcia, Mariah)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket8, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket7, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 96 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendants Signature Healthcare Services, LLC and Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital, LLC's motion to withdraw Joel T. Pelz and Matthew R. Devine as counsel #95 is granted. Mailed notice. (dm, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 95 MOTION by Defendants Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital LLC, Signature Healthcare Services, LLC to withdraw Joel T. Pelz and Matthew R. Devine of Jenner & Block LLP as counsel (Martin, Craig)
April 20, 2020 Filing 94 NOTICE by Laura L. Norris of Change of Address (Norris, Laura)
April 20, 2020 Filing 93 NOTICE by Craig Christopher Martin of Change of Address (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Martin, Craig)
April 17, 2020 Filing 92 STATUS Report by Beverly J. Walker (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Certificate of Service)(Greenspan, Barbara)
April 6, 2020 Filing 91 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: In light of Second Amended General Order 20-0012 dated March 30, 2020, initial status hearing, Plaintiff's motion to appoint and substitute special representative for Defendant George Sheldon #44 set for 4/22/20 is stricken. Counsel for Ms. Beverly Walker is ordered to file a status report by 4/17/20 and indicate whether her office will be representing or providing representation for Mr. Sheldon in his individual capacity. In light of the pandemic and the General Orders regarding same, defendants Kasyoki and Bluitt are given until 5/19/20 to answer or otherwise plead. In light of that extension, Plaintiffs are granted until 6/26/20 to respond to all pending pleadings. Any replies are due 7/17/20. The status set for 4/22/20 is stricken and reset to 7/23/20 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (dm, )
April 3, 2020 Filing 90 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Dion Dill by Matthew Edward Rechtoris (Rechtoris, Matthew)
April 3, 2020 Filing 89 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Dion Dill by Matthew Kaminski (Kaminski, Matthew)
April 3, 2020 Filing 88 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Dion Dill by Daria Ann Porta (Porta, Daria)
April 3, 2020 Filing 87 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Dion Dill by Michael Thomas Koptik (Koptik, Michael)
April 3, 2020 Filing 86 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Dion Dill by Michael E. Prangle (Prangle, Michael)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket12, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 83 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: In light of Amended General Order 20-0012 dated March 16, 2020, initial status hearing, Plaintiff's motion to appoint and substitute special representative for Defendant George Sheldon #44 , reset to 4/22/20 at 9:45am. Counsel for Ms. Beverly Walker is ordered to appear at the motion hearing set for 4/22/20 at 9:45am and be prepared to report whether her client will be representing Mr. Sheldon in his individual capacity. Defendants Richard Kasyoki's and Tausha Bluitt's motions for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead [74 and 75] are granted. Defendants' responsive pleadings are due 3/31/20. Defendant Eve Brownstone, LCPC's motion to dismiss #40 and Signature Healthcare Services, LLC and Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital, LLLC's motion to dismiss #64 , Defendant David Fletcher-Janzen's motion to dismiss #77 , Defendant Nikolay Katsarov's motion to dismiss #79 , and Defendant Adebola Majekodunmi's motion to dismiss #81 set for 3/20/20 are stricken. Responses to all Motions to Dismiss (including Kasyoki's and Bluitt's if they file a motion) shall be filed by 5/8/20 any replies are due 5/22/20. Mailed notice. (dm, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM by Andebola Majekodunmi in support of motion to dismiss #81 PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT UNDER RULE 12(b) AND MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT UNDER RULE 12(e) (Koptik, Michael)
March 16, 2020 Filing 81 MOTION by Defendant Andebola Majekodunmi to dismiss PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT UNDER RULE 12(b) AND MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT UNDER RULE 12(e) (Koptik, Michael)
March 16, 2020 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM by Nikolay Katsarov in support of motion to dismiss #79 PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT UNDER RULE 12(b) AND MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT UNDER RULE 12(e) (Porta, Daria)
March 16, 2020 Filing 79 MOTION by Defendant Nikolay Katsarov to dismiss PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT UNDER RULE 12(b) AND MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT UNDER RULE 12(e) (Porta, Daria)
March 16, 2020 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM by David Fletcher-Jazen in support of motion to dismiss #77 PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT UNDER RULE 12(b) AND MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT UNDER RULE 12(e) (Prangle, Michael)
March 16, 2020 Filing 77 MOTION by Defendant David Fletcher-Jazen to dismiss PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT UNDER RULE 12(b) AND MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT UNDER RULE 12(e) (Prangle, Michael)
March 13, 2020 Filing 76 STATUS Report (Joint) by Charles P. Golbert (Drury, Scott)
March 13, 2020 Filing 75 MOTION by Defendant Tausha Bluitt for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Complaint (Koptik, Michael)
March 13, 2020 Filing 74 MOTION by Defendant Richard Kasyoki for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiffs Complaint (Koptik, Michael)
March 13, 2020 Filing 73 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Beverly Mims by Barbara Lynn Greenspan (Greenspan, Barbara)
March 11, 2020 Filing 72 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tausha Bluitt by Michael Thomas Koptik (Koptik, Michael)
March 11, 2020 Filing 71 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tausha Bluitt by Michael E. Prangle (Prangle, Michael)
March 11, 2020 Filing 70 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tausha Bluitt by Matthew Kaminski (Kaminski, Matthew)
March 11, 2020 Filing 69 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles P. Golbert as to Niama Malachi on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (Drury, Scott)
March 6, 2020 Filing 68 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On the Court's own motion, Defendants Signature Healthcare Services, LLC and Aurora ChicagoLakeshore Hospital, LLC's motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' complaint under rule 12(b) and motion for a more definite statement under rule 12(e) set for 3/10/20 is reset to 3/20/20 at 9:45am. Mailed notice. (dm, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 67 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: By agreement of the parties, Initial status hearing, Defendant Eve Brownstone, LCPC's motion to dismiss #40 and Plaintiff's motion to appoint and substitute special representative for Defendant George Sheldon #44 set for 3/13/20 are stricken and reset to 3/20/20 at 9:45am. Counsel for Ms. Beverly Walker is ordered to appear at the motion hearing set for 3/20/20 at 9:45am. Mailed notice. (dm, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE of Motion by Craig Christopher Martin for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, motion for more definite statement, #64 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 3/10/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Martin, Craig)
March 5, 2020 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM by Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital LLC, Signature Healthcare Services, LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, motion for more definite statement, #64 (Martin, Craig)
March 5, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital LLC, Signature Healthcare Services, LLC and, MOTION by Defendants Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital LLC, Signature Healthcare Services, LLCfor more definite statement (Martin, Craig)
March 3, 2020 Filing 63 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendants Signature Healthcare Services, LLC and Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital, LLC's motion for leave to file excess pages #61 is granted. Defendants are granted leave to file a memorandum of up to 30 pages. No appearance necessary on 3/5/20. Mailed notice. (dm, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Motion by Craig Christopher Martin for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #61 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 3/5/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Martin, Craig)
March 2, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION by Defendants Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital LLC, Signature Healthcare Services, LLC for leave to file excess pages (Martin, Craig)
March 2, 2020 Filing 60 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendant Andebola Majekodunmi's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to complaint #57 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead by 3/16/20. Mailed notice. (dm, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 59 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Denise Ellis, Michael C. Jones, Brooke Sloan, Tierney Stutz, Beverly J. Walker by Michaelina Gianaris Camp (Camp, Michaelina)
March 2, 2020 Filing 58 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Tierney Stutz, Beverly J. Walker by Barbara Lynn Greenspan (Greenspan, Barbara)
February 28, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION by Defendant Andebola Majekodunmi for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Complaint (Koptik, Michael)
February 27, 2020 Filing 56 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On the Court's own motion, Defendant Eve Brownstone, LCPC's motion to dismiss #40 and Plaintiff's motion to appoint and substitute special representative for Defendant George Sheldon #44 set for 3/3/20 are stricken and reset to 3/13/20 at 1:30pm. Mailed notice. (dm, )
February 27, 2020 Filing 55 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Andebola Majekodunmi by Michael Thomas Koptik (Koptik, Michael)
February 27, 2020 Filing 54 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendant David Fletcher-Janzen's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to complaint #48 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead by 3/16/20. Mailed notice. (dm, )
February 27, 2020 Filing 53 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Denise Ellis, Michael C. Jones, Brooke Sloan by Barbara Lynn Greenspan (Greenspan, Barbara)
February 26, 2020 Filing 52 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles P. Golbert as to Brooke Sloan on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (Drury, Scott)
February 26, 2020 Filing 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles P. Golbert as to Nikolay Katsarov on 2/23/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (Drury, Scott)
February 26, 2020 Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles P. Golbert as to Richard Kasyoki on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (Drury, Scott)
February 25, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Motion by Daria Ann Porta for presentment of extension of time #48 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 3/3/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Porta, Daria)
February 25, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION by Defendant David Fletcher-Jazen for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Complaint (Porta, Daria)
February 25, 2020 Filing 47 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants David Fletcher-Jazen, Nikolay Katsarov by Sabina Babel (Babel, Sabina)
February 25, 2020 Filing 46 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital LLC, David Fletcher-Jazen, Nikolay Katsarov, Signature Healthcare Services, LLC by Daria Ann Porta (Porta, Daria)
February 25, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Motion by Mariah Esperanza Garcia for presentment of motion to substitute party #44 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 3/3/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Garcia, Mariah)
February 25, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION by Plaintiff Charles P. Golbert to substitute party Defendant George Sheldon (Garcia, Mariah)
February 24, 2020 Filing 43 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Marco Leonardo, Neil Skene by Michaelina Gianaris Camp (Camp, Michaelina)
February 24, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Motion by Christopher John Drinkwine for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #40 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 3/3/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Drinkwine, Christopher)
February 24, 2020 Filing 41 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Eve Brownstone (Drinkwine, Christopher)
February 24, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Eve Brownstone (Drinkwine, Christopher)
February 24, 2020 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles P. Golbert as to Michael C. Jones on 2/20/2020, answer due 3/12/2020. (Drury, Scott)
February 24, 2020 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles P. Golbert as to Denise Ellis on 2/20/2020, answer due 3/12/2020. (Drury, Scott)
February 24, 2020 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles P. Golbert as to Dion Dill on 2/17/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Drury, Scott)
February 21, 2020 Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Eve Brownstone by Christopher John Drinkwine (Drinkwine, Christopher)
February 21, 2020 Filing 35 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Eve Brownstone by Andrew J Roth (Roth, Andrew)
February 18, 2020 Filing 34 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant David Fletcher-Jazen by Michael E. Prangle (Prangle, Michael)
February 18, 2020 Filing 33 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant David Fletcher-Jazen by Matthew Kaminski (Kaminski, Matthew)
February 14, 2020 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles P. Golbert as to Tausha Bluitt on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Drury, Scott)
February 14, 2020 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles P. Golbert as to Tierney Stutz on 2/9/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Drury, Scott)
February 14, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Niama Malachi. (ng, )
February 10, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles P. Golbert as to Eve Brownstone on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Drury, Scott)
February 10, 2020 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles P. Golbert as to David Fletcher-Jazen on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Drury, Scott)
February 10, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles P. Golbert as to Andebola Majekodunmi on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Drury, Scott)
February 10, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles P. Golbert as to Shane Michaels on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Drury, Scott)
February 6, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Denise Ellis. (ecw, )
February 6, 2020 Filing 26 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Beverly J. Walker on 1/28/2020 by Plaintiff Charles P. Golbert. Waiver of service due by 2/27/2020. (Drury, Scott)
February 6, 2020 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendants Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital, LLC and Signature Healthcare Services. LLC's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #17 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead by 3/5/20. No appearance necessary on 2/11/20. Initial status hearing set for 3/6/20 is stricken and reset to 3/13/20 at 1:30pm. No later than five business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. Mailed notice. (dm, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Charles P. Golbert by Mariah Esperanza Garcia (Garcia, Mariah)
February 5, 2020 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Charles P. Golbert by Jonathan I. Loevy (Loevy, Jonathan)
February 5, 2020 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Charles P. Golbert by Arthur R. Loevy (Loevy, Arthur)
February 5, 2020 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Charles P. Golbert by Scott Robert Drury (Drury, Scott)
February 4, 2020 Filing 20 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Signature Healthcare Services, LLC (Martin, Craig)
February 4, 2020 Filing 19 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital LLC (Martin, Craig)
February 4, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Craig Christopher Martin for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #17 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 2/11/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Martin, Craig)
February 4, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendants Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital LLC, Signature Healthcare Services, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 - Defendants Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital, LLC and Signature Healthcare Services, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Complaint (Martin, Craig)
February 4, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital LLC, Signature Healthcare Services, LLC by Sabina Babel (Babel, Sabina)
February 4, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital LLC, Signature Healthcare Services, LLC by Matthew Kaminski (Kaminski, Matthew)
February 4, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital LLC, Signature Healthcare Services, LLC by Michael E. Prangle (Prangle, Michael)
February 4, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital LLC, Signature Healthcare Services, LLC by Laura L. Norris (Norris, Laura)
February 4, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital LLC, Signature Healthcare Services, LLC by Matthew R Devine (Devine, Matthew)
February 4, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital LLC, Signature Healthcare Services, LLC by Joel T. Pelz (Pelz, Joel)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital LLC, Signature Healthcare Services, LLC by Craig Christopher Martin (Martin, Craig)
January 29, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles P. Golbert as to Beverly Mims on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. (Drury, Scott)
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles P. Golbert as to Marco Leonardo on 1/16/2020, answer due 2/6/2020. (Drury, Scott)
January 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles P. Golbert as to Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital LLC on 1/16/2020, answer due 2/6/2020. (Drury, Scott)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Marco Leonardo, Neil Skene by Barbara Lynn Greenspan (Greenspan, Barbara)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles P. Golbert as to Neil Skene served on 1/17/2020, answer due 3/17/2020 (Drury, Scott)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles P. Golbert as to Signature Healthcare Services, LLC on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020. (Drury, Scott)
January 13, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital LLC, Andebola Majekodunmi, Signature Healthcare Services, LLC (txl, )
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Initial status hearing is set for 3/6/20 at 1:30 p.m. No later than five business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. Mailed notice. (dm, )
January 10, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Richard Kasyoki, Nikolay Katsarov, Shane Michaels, Beverly Mims, Elisabeth Schei, Neil Skene (txl, )
January 9, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Tausha Bluitt, Eve Brownstone, Dion Dill, David Fletcher-Jazen, Michael C. Jones, Marco Leonardo, Brooke Sloan, Tierney Stutz, Beverly J. Walker (txl, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
December 18, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Golbert v. Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital LLC et al filed by Charles P. Golbert; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Drury, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golbert v. Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Kasyoki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly J. Walker
Represented By: Barbara Lynn Greenspan
Represented By: Michaelina Gianaris Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Mims
Represented By: Barbara Lynn Greenspan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Skene
Represented By: Barbara Lynn Greenspan
Represented By: Michaelina Gianaris Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niama Malachi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Michaels
Represented By: Matthew Kaminski
Represented By: Michael E. Prangle
Represented By: Michael Thomas Koptik
Represented By: Daria Ann Porta
Represented By: Matthew Edward Rechtoris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dion Dill
Represented By: Matthew Kaminski
Represented By: Michael E. Prangle
Represented By: Michael Thomas Koptik
Represented By: Daria Ann Porta
Represented By: Matthew Edward Rechtoris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tausha Bluitt
Represented By: Matthew Kaminski
Represented By: Michael E. Prangle
Represented By: Michael Thomas Koptik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C. Jones
Represented By: Barbara Lynn Greenspan
Represented By: Michaelina Gianaris Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elisabeth Schei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andebola Majekodunmi
Represented By: Michael Thomas Koptik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tierney Stutz
Represented By: Barbara Lynn Greenspan
Represented By: Michaelina Gianaris Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eve Brownstone
Represented By: Christopher John Drinkwine
Represented By: Andrew J Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marco Leonardo
Represented By: Barbara Lynn Greenspan
Represented By: Michaelina Gianaris Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Chicago Lakeshore Hospital LLC
Represented By: Craig Christopher Martin
Represented By: Laura L. Norris
Represented By: Matthew Kaminski
Represented By: Sabina Babel
Represented By: Matthew R Devine
Represented By: Joel T. Pelz
Represented By: Michael E. Prangle
Represented By: Daria Ann Porta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Ellis
Represented By: Barbara Lynn Greenspan
Represented By: Michaelina Gianaris Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Fletcher-Jazen
Represented By: Matthew Kaminski
Represented By: Sabina Babel
Represented By: Michael E. Prangle
Represented By: Daria Ann Porta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooke Sloan
Represented By: Barbara Lynn Greenspan
Represented By: Michaelina Gianaris Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikolay Katsarov
Represented By: Sabina Babel
Represented By: Daria Ann Porta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signature Healthcare Services, LLC
Represented By: Craig Christopher Martin
Represented By: Laura L. Norris
Represented By: Matthew Kaminski
Represented By: Sabina Babel
Represented By: Matthew R Devine
Represented By: Joel T. Pelz
Represented By: Michael E. Prangle
Represented By: Daria Ann Porta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles P. Golbert
Represented By: Scott Robert Drury
Represented By: Arthur R. Loevy
Represented By: Jonathan I. Loevy
Represented By: Mariah Esperanza Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?