Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative et al v. Agri Stats, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Gross and Company, Inc. and Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative
Defendant: Kraft Foods Group Brands LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Agri Stats, Inc., Hormel Foods, LLC, House of Raeford Farms, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., Butterball LLC, Farbest Foods, Inc., Foster Poultry Farms, Foster Farms, LLC, Kraft Heinz Foods Company, Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Cooper Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, The Hillshire Brands Company, Cargill, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc. and Perdue Farms, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv08318
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 115 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Agri Stats, Inc. (Bernick, Justin)
February 3, 2020 Filing 114 MINUTE entry (Corrected) before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. The Court adopts Parties' Stipulation and proposed Briefing Schedule #111 . Defendants shall file any motions to dismiss or other responsive pleadings by March 31, 2020, pursuant to the Court's Order (Dkt. 92). Plaintiffs' responses to any motions to dismiss or other responsive pleadings shall be filed by April 30, 2020. Defendants' replies in support of their motions to dismiss shall be filed by May 21, 2020. Plaintiffs and Defendants shall meet-and-confer regarding appropriate page limits to apply to the parties' briefing on the motions to dismiss and will submit a proposal for the Court's consideration by February 28, 2020. (pdf not attached initially)Mailed notice (lk, )
February 3, 2020 Filing 113 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. The Court adopts Parties' Stipulation and proposed Briefing Schedule #111 . Defendants shall file any motions to dismiss or other responsive pleadings by March 31, 2020, pursuant to the Court's Order (Dkt. 92). Plaintiffs' responses to any motions to dismiss or other responsive pleadings shall be filed by April 30, 2020. 3.Defendants' replies in support of their motions to dismiss shall be filed by May 21, 2020. Plaintiffs and Defendants shall meet-and-confer regarding appropriate page limits to apply to the parties' briefing on the motions to dismiss and will submit a proposal for the Court's consideration by February 28, 2020. Motions due by 4/30/2020.Mailed notice(lk, )
February 3, 2020 Filing 112 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorneys William Monts, Justin Bernick, Mark Ryan and Henry Jones's Motions to appear pro hac vice #101 , #102 , #104 and #107 are granted. Mailed notice (lk, )
January 31, 2020 Filing 111 STIPULATION and Proposed Briefing Schedule (Miller, Britt)
January 31, 2020 Filing 110 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Hormel Foods Corporation (Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Notice as to Affiliates Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2) (Kingsbury, Colby)
January 31, 2020 Filing 109 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Hormel Foods, LLC (Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Notice as to Affiliates Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2) (Kingsbury, Colby)
January 29, 2020 Filing 108 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by House of Raeford Farms, Inc. (Wrobel, Gregory)
January 28, 2020 Filing 107 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16665095. (Jones, Henry)
January 28, 2020 Filing 106 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant House of Raeford Farms, Inc. by Joshua A. Dunn (Dunn, Joshua)
January 28, 2020 Filing 105 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant House of Raeford Farms, Inc. by Gregory Gene Wrobel (Wrobel, Gregory)
January 28, 2020 Filing 104 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16661771. (Ryan, Mark)
January 27, 2020 Filing 103 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative by Simeon Andrew Morbey (Morbey, Simeon)
January 24, 2020 Filing 102 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16650319. (Bernick, Justin)
January 24, 2020 Filing 101 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16649895. (Monts, William)
January 23, 2020 Filing 100 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorneys Stephen Chuk, Christopher Ondeck and Rucha Desai's Motions to appear pro hac vice #96 , #97 and #98 are granted. Mailed notice (lk, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 99 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Agri Stats, Inc. by Jacob D Koering (Koering, Jacob)
January 21, 2020 Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16635822. on behalf of Butterball LLC (Desai, Rucha)
January 21, 2020 Filing 97 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16635768. on behalf of Butterball LLC (Chuk, Stephen)
January 21, 2020 Filing 96 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16635729. on behalf of Butterball LLC (Ondeck, Christopher)
January 21, 2020 Filing 95 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Butterball LLC by Marc Eric Rosenthal (Rosenthal, Marc)
January 21, 2020 Filing 94 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Inc. by Robert Edward Entwisle (Entwisle, Robert)
January 21, 2020 Filing 93 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorneys Kathryn Hibbard, David Barthel, Theodore Munsell, Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh, Lindsey Strang Aberg, and Rachel J Adcox's Motions for Pro Hac Vice #72 , #74 , #81 , #89 , #90 and #91 are granted. Mailed notice (lk, )
January 20, 2020 Filing 91 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16632497. (Adcox, Rachel)
January 17, 2020 Filing 90 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16630841. (Aberg, Lindsey)
January 17, 2020 Filing 89 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16630690. (Rohrbaugh, Tiffany)
January 17, 2020 Filing 88 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. by Sahrish Moyeed (Moyeed, Sahrish)
January 17, 2020 Filing 87 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. by Jordan Matthew Tank (Tank, Jordan)
January 16, 2020 Filing 92 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motion hearing held on 1/16/2020. Plaintiffs' Motion to reassign case to Judge Durkin #47 is taken under advisement. Defendants' Motion for extension of time to file Answer #53 and Defendant Farbest Foods, Inc.'s Motion for Joinder #61 of Motion for extension of time to file Answer #53 are granted. Answer shall be filed by 3/31/2020. Status hearing reset for 4/14/2020 at 9:00 AM. Status hearing set for 2/26/2020 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 86 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Kraft Foods Group Brands LLC, Kraft Heinz Foods Company and Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 of Defendants Kraft Heinz Foods Company and Kraft Foods Group Brands LLC (McKeown, James)
January 16, 2020 Filing 85 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kraft Foods Group Brands LLC, Kraft Heinz Foods Company by Joanne L. Molinaro (Molinaro, Joanne)
January 16, 2020 Filing 84 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kraft Foods Group Brands LLC, Kraft Heinz Foods Company by Jeanne Marie Gills (Gills, Jeanne)
January 16, 2020 Filing 83 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kraft Foods Group Brands LLC, Kraft Heinz Foods Company by James T. McKeown (McKeown, James)
January 16, 2020 Filing 82 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Farbest Foods, Inc. (Sciaccotta, Michael)
January 16, 2020 Filing 81 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16623361. (Munsell, Theodore)
January 15, 2020 Filing 80 RESPONSE by John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperativein Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Inc., Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Hormel Foods Corporation, Hormel Foods, LLC, Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #53 , MOTION by Defendant Farbest Foods, Inc. for joinder Joinder in Motion of Certain Defendants' First Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint #61 (Berman, Steve)
January 15, 2020 Filing 79 AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative as to Agri Stats, Inc. on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020. (Scarlett, Shana) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 1/15/2020 (ph, ).
January 15, 2020 Filing 78 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms (Zarlenga, Carmine)
January 15, 2020 Filing 77 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Cooper Farms, Inc. (Sechler, Joel)
January 15, 2020 Filing 76 RESPONSE by Defendant Cooper Farms, Inc. to motion to reassign case #47 (Sechler, Joel)
January 15, 2020 Filing 75 RESPONSE by Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Inc., Farbest Foods, Inc., Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Hormel Foods Corporation, Hormel Foods, LLC, Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC to MOTION by Plaintiffs John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative to reassign case #47 (Miller, Britt)
January 15, 2020 Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16617813. (Barthel, David)
January 14, 2020 Filing 73 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Inc. (Miller, Britt)
January 14, 2020 Filing 72 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16616386. (Hibbard, Kathryn)
January 14, 2020 Filing 71 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cooper Farms, Inc. by Daniel D Birk (Birk, Daniel)
January 14, 2020 Filing 70 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cooper Farms, Inc. by Michael Lee McCluggage (McCluggage, Michael)
January 14, 2020 Filing 69 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative as to Hormel Foods, LLC on 1/3/2020, answer due 1/24/2020. (Scarlett, Shana)
January 14, 2020 Filing 68 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative as to Cooper Farms, Inc. on 1/3/2020, answer due 1/24/2020. (Scarlett, Shana)
January 14, 2020 Filing 67 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative as to House of Raeford Farms, Inc. on 1/3/2020, answer due 1/24/2020. (Scarlett, Shana)
January 14, 2020 Filing 66 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorneys Gaspare Joseph Bono,John William Lomas, Jr,Claire Molle' Maddox,Jennifer A. L. Battle,Jill Rogers Spiker and Leslie Barry's Motions to appear pro hac vice #57 , #58 , #59 , #60 , #63 #64 and #65 are granted. Mailed notice (lk, )
January 14, 2020 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16613246. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Bar Admissions)(Spiker, Jill)
January 14, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16612575. (Sechler, Joel)
January 14, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16612529. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Bar Admissions)(Battle, Jennifer)
January 13, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Motion by Michael K Sciaccotta, First for presentment of motion for joinder #61 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 1/27/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Sciaccotta, Michael)
January 13, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION by Defendant Farbest Foods, Inc. for joinder Joinder in Motion of Certain Defendants' First Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint (Sciaccotta, Michael)
January 13, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16609415. (Leslie, Barry)
January 13, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16609374. (Maddox, Claire)
January 13, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16609337. (Lomas, John)
January 13, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16609266. (Bono, Gaspare)
January 13, 2020 Filing 56 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cooper Farms, Inc. by Joshua Goldberg (Goldberg, Joshua)
January 13, 2020 Filing 55 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Farbest Foods, Inc. by Michael K Sciaccotta, First (Sciaccotta, Michael)
January 10, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Motion by Britt Marie Miller for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #53 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 1/16/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Miller, Britt)
January 10, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION by Defendants Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Inc., Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Hormel Foods Corporation, Hormel Foods, LLC, Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Miller, Britt)
January 10, 2020 Filing 52 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation by Britt Marie Miller (Miller, Britt)
January 10, 2020 Filing 51 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cargill, Inc. by Britt Marie Miller (Miller, Britt)
January 10, 2020 Filing 50 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorneys Christopher Kreuder, Isaac Hall, Emily Chow, Craig Coleman, Richard Duncan, Danielle Foley, Lisa Fales and Andrew Hernacki's #29 , #30 , #31 , #37 , #38 , #39 , #40 , #41 , #43 , #44 and #45 are granted. Mailed notice (lk, )
January 10, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Motion by Steve W. Berman for presentment of motion to reassign case #47 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 1/16/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Berman, Steve)
January 10, 2020 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM by John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative in support of motion to reassign case #47 (Berman, Steve)
January 10, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION by Plaintiffs John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative to reassign case (Berman, Steve)
January 10, 2020 Filing 46 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC by Kirstin Beth Ives (Ives, Kirstin)
January 10, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16603338. (Hernacki, Andrew)
January 10, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16603229. (Fales, Lisa)
January 10, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16602850. (Foley, Danielle)
January 10, 2020 Filing 42 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC by James Douglas Baldridge (Baldridge, James)
January 9, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16600615. (Duncan, Richard)
January 9, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16600409. (Coleman, Craig)
January 9, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16599925. (Chow, Emily)
January 9, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16599740. (Hall, Isaac)
January 9, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16599633. (Kreuder, Christopher)
January 7, 2020 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative as to Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Scarlett, Shana)
January 7, 2020 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative as to Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Scarlett, Shana)
January 7, 2020 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative as to Tyson Foods, Inc. on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Scarlett, Shana)
January 7, 2020 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative as to Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Scarlett, Shana)
January 7, 2020 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative as to Cargill, Inc. on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Scarlett, Shana)
January 7, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16590384. (Stallings, William)
January 7, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16590325. (Medlock, Stephen)
January 7, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16590282. (Pottinger, Oral)
January 7, 2020 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms by Carmine R. Zarlenga (Zarlenga, Carmine)
January 7, 2020 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative by Rio Shaye Pierce (Pierce, Rio)
January 7, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative as to Perdue Farms, Inc. on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Scarlett, Shana)
January 7, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative as to Farbest Foods, Inc. on 1/3/2020, answer due 1/24/2020. (Scarlett, Shana)
January 7, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative as to Agri Stats, Inc. on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020. (Scarlett, Shana)
January 7, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative as to Butterball LLC on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Scarlett, Shana)
January 7, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative as to Perdue Foods LLC on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Scarlett, Shana)
January 7, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative as to Kraft Foods Group Brands LLC on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Scarlett, Shana)
January 7, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative as to The Hillshire Brands Company on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Scarlett, Shana)
January 7, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative as to Foster Farms, LLC on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Scarlett, Shana)
January 7, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative as to Kraft Heinz Foods Company on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Scarlett, Shana)
January 7, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative as to Hormel Foods Corporation on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Scarlett, Shana)
January 7, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative as to Foster Poultry Farms on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Scarlett, Shana)
January 7, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative by Shana Scarlett (Scarlett, Shana)
January 6, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Hormel Foods Corporation, Hormel Foods, LLC by Colby Anne Kingsbury (Kingsbury, Colby)
December 31, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 2/26/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 2/19/2020. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Attorneys Shana Scarlett, Rio Pierce, Clifford Pearson, Bobby Pouya and Michael Pearson's Motions to appear pro hac vice #7 , #8 , #9 , #10 and #11 are granted. Mailed notice (lk, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (rp, )
December 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16566061. (Pearson, Michael)
December 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16566038. (Pouya, Bobby)
December 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16565990. (PEARSON, CLIFFORD)
December 26, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Agri Stats, Inc., Butterball LLC, Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation, Cargill, Inc., Cooper Farms, Inc., Farbest Foods, Inc., Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Hormel Foods Corporation, Hormel Foods, LLC, House of Raeford Farms, Inc., Kraft Foods Group Brands LLC, Kraft Heinz Foods Company, Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, The Hillshire Brands Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. (pj, )
December 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16563782. (Pierce, Rio)
December 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16563780. (Scarlett, Shana)
December 23, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative by Maureen Kane Berg (Berg, Maureen)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative by Brian David Clark (Clark, Brian)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative by W. Joseph Bruckner (Bruckner, W.)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative by Steve W. Berman (Berman, Steve)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Berman, Steve)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by John Gross and Company, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16551302.(Berman, Steve)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative et al v. Agri Stats, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft Foods Group Brands LLC
Represented By: James T. McKeown
Represented By: Jeanne Marie Gills
Represented By: Joanne L. Molinaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hormel Foods Corporation
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Chow
Represented By: Christopher Allen Kreuder
Represented By: Craig Stuart Coleman
Represented By: Colby Anne Kingsbury
Represented By: Richard Alan Duncan
Represented By: Isaac Baxter Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agri Stats, Inc.
Represented By: William L Monts, III
Represented By: Justin Wade Bernick
Represented By: Jacob D Koering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hormel Foods, LLC
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Chow
Represented By: Christopher Allen Kreuder
Represented By: Craig Stuart Coleman
Represented By: Colby Anne Kingsbury
Represented By: Richard Alan Duncan
Represented By: Isaac Baxter Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: House of Raeford Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Henry W. Jones, Junio
Represented By: Gregory Gene Wrobel
Represented By: Joshua A. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel J Adcox
Represented By: Jordan Matthew Tank
Represented By: Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh
Represented By: Lindsey Strang Aberg
Represented By: Sahrish Moyeed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butterball LLC
Represented By: Rucha A Desai
Represented By: Christopher E Ondeck
Represented By: Marc Eric Rosenthal
Represented By: Stephen R Chuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farbest Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Gaspare Joseph Bono
Represented By: Claire Molle' Maddox
Represented By: Michael K Sciaccotta, First
Represented By: Barry A. Leslie
Represented By: John William Lomas, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Poultry Farms
Represented By: William Stallings
Represented By: Oral Pottinger
Represented By: Carmine R. Zarlenga
Represented By: Stephen M. Medlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Farms, LLC
Represented By: William Stallings
Represented By: Oral Pottinger
Represented By: Carmine R. Zarlenga
Represented By: Stephen M. Medlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft Heinz Foods Company
Represented By: James T. McKeown
Represented By: Jeanne Marie Gills
Represented By: Joanne L. Molinaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel J Adcox
Represented By: Jordan Matthew Tank
Represented By: Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh
Represented By: Lindsey Strang Aberg
Represented By: Sahrish Moyeed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Goldberg
Represented By: Jill Rogers Spiker
Represented By: Jennifer A. L. Battle
Represented By: Theodore M Munsell
Represented By: Daniel D Birk
Represented By: Joel Everett Sechler
Represented By: Michael Lee McCluggage
Represented By: David John Barthel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perdue Foods LLC
Represented By: Danielle R Foley
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Hernacki
Represented By: Lisa Jose Fales
Represented By: Kirstin Beth Ives
Represented By: James Douglas Baldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation
Represented By: Kathryn Nikolai Hibbard
Represented By: Britt Marie Miller
Represented By: Robert Edward Entwisle
Represented By: Mark W. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hillshire Brands Company
Represented By: Rachel J Adcox
Represented By: Jordan Matthew Tank
Represented By: Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh
Represented By: Lindsey Strang Aberg
Represented By: Sahrish Moyeed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Nikolai Hibbard
Represented By: Britt Marie Miller
Represented By: Robert Edward Entwisle
Represented By: Mark W. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel J Adcox
Represented By: Jordan Matthew Tank
Represented By: Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh
Represented By: Lindsey Strang Aberg
Represented By: Sahrish Moyeed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perdue Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Danielle R Foley
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Hernacki
Represented By: Lisa Jose Fales
Represented By: Kirstin Beth Ives
Represented By: James Douglas Baldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gross and Company, Inc.
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Shana Scarlett
Represented By: W. Joseph Bruckner
Represented By: Michael H. Pearson
Represented By: Brian David Clark
Represented By: Bobby Pouya
Represented By: Maureen Kane Berg
Represented By: Rio Shaye Pierce
Represented By: Clifford Harris Pearson
Represented By: Simeon Andrew Morbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Shana Scarlett
Represented By: W. Joseph Bruckner
Represented By: Michael H. Pearson
Represented By: Rio Shaye Pierce
Represented By: Brian David Clark
Represented By: Bobby Pouya
Represented By: Maureen Kane Berg
Represented By: Clifford Harris Pearson
Represented By: Simeon Andrew Morbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?