Mathews v. Fox College, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ms. Nicole Mathews and Nicole Mathews
Defendant: Fox College, Bradford Schools, Inc. and Fox College, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv08359
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2020 Filing 17 BRADFORD SCHOOLS, INC. ANSWER to Complaint OF NICOLE MATTHEWS by Bradford Schools, Inc.(Caruso, Carmen)
February 17, 2020 Filing 16 FOX COLLEGE, INC. ANSWER to Complaint OF NICOLE MATTHEWS by Fox College, Inc(Caruso, Carmen)
February 17, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendants Bradford Schools, Inc., Fox College, Inc for disclosure Fox College, Inc. and Bradford Schools, Inc. (Caruso, Carmen)
February 14, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by Bradford Schools, Inc., Fox College, Inc in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #11 CORRECTED (Cao, Xiaoyin)
February 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Xiaoyin Cao for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #11 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 2/19/2020 at 10:30 AM. (Cao, Xiaoyin)
February 14, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by Bradford Schools, Inc., Fox College, Inc in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #11 (Cao, Xiaoyin)
February 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Bradford Schools, Inc., Fox College, Inc (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Cao, Xiaoyin)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Nicole Mathews (Stamatoglou, Alexandros)
January 24, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bradford Schools, Inc., Fox College, Inc by John Jay Myers (Myers, John)
January 23, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Attorney John J. Myers' motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #7 on behalf of the defendants is granted. Mailed notice (is, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16645670. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Caruso, Carmen)
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Initial status hearing previously set for 2/19/2020 to stand, but the time of that hearing is changed to 10:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bradford Schools, Inc., Fox College, Inc by Xiaoyin Cao (Cao, Xiaoyin)
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Initial status hearing set for 2/19/2020 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Stamatoglou, Alexandros)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nicole Mathews by Alexandros Stamatoglou (Stamatoglou, Alexandros)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Nicole Mathews; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16555190.(Stamatoglou, Alexandros)
December 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathews v. Fox College, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Nicole Mathews
Represented By: Alexandros Stamatoglou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Mathews
Represented By: Alexandros Stamatoglou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradford Schools, Inc.
Represented By: John Jay Myers
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox College, Inc
Represented By: John Jay Myers
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?