Wu v. Kallies et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Alan Wu
Defendant: Mr. Thomas Kallies, Southern Cross Resources Group, Inc., Jeffrey Pozen, Andrew L. Madenberg, Mrs. Robin Nasatir and Michael A. Nasatir
Case Number: 1:2019cv08388
Filed: December 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Alan Wu re status report #10 Notice of Filing (Shaw, Caryn)
February 17, 2020 Filing 10 STATUS Report Initial Status Report by Alan Wu (Shaw, Caryn)
February 17, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Alan Wu. Thomas Kallies waiver sent on 2/2/2020, answer due 4/2/2020. (Shaw, Caryn)
February 17, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Alan Wu. Jeffrey Pozen waiver sent on 1/8/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Shaw, Caryn)
January 28, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Thomas Kallies, Andrew L. Madenberg, Michael A. Nasatir, Robin Nasatir (daj, )
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 2/25/2020 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 2/18/2020. Mailed notice (rj, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
December 23, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alan Wu by Darryl Tom (Shaw, Caryn) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) (sxb, ).
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alan Wu by Anne I Shaw (Shaw, Caryn) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) (sxb, ).
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alan Wu by Caryn I Shaw (Shaw, Caryn)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Shaw, Caryn)
December 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Alan Wu; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16559132.(Shaw, Caryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wu v. Kallies et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Thomas Kallies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Cross Resources Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Pozen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew L. Madenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Robin Nasatir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Nasatir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Alan Wu
Represented By: Caryn I Shaw
Represented By: Darryl Tom
Represented By: Anne I-Pin Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?