Gonzales v. Todays Growth Consultant, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph M Gonzales
Defendant: Todays Growth Consultant, Inc.
Receiver: Melanie Damian
Case Number: 1:2019cv08471
Filed: December 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: This Court received the Notice of Appointment of Receiver and Stay of Litigation (Dckt. No. #7 ). The Receiver basically informed this Court that this Court's own case is stayed, in light of an Order entered in a parallel action filed by the United States Securities and Exchange Commission (19-cv-8454). In light of that parallel action, this Court stays this case pending further Order of Court. The Receiver shall file a short status report on Monday, April 6, 2020, and shall file an updated status report once every three months (on the first Monday of April, July, October, January). The status hearing previously set for March 17, 2020 and the other obligations set forth in this Court's minute order dated December 30, 2019 (Dckt. No. #5 ) are hereby stricken. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Melanie Damian Notice of Appointment of Receiver and Stay of Litigation (Duff, Kevin)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Receiver Melanie Damian by Kevin Buckley Duff (Duff, Kevin)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status hearing is set for March 17, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Report" on the Court's website. At least two weeks before the hearing, the parties must discuss settlement in good faith, and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. The parties also must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court before the initial status hearing. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) by March 12, 2020. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. Second, the parties must submit a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Please note that the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report on the Court's docket, but must email (i.e., not file on the docket) the proposed Scheduling Order to the Court's proposed order inbox. The initial status hearing will be the scheduling conference contemplated by Rule 16(b). Lead counsel for the parties must participate in the initial status conference. Counsel must be prepared to discuss the status of settlement, as well as the proposed discovery plan. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process by one week before the initial status hearing, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status hearing. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
December 30, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Todays Growth Consultant, Inc. (ecw, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, )
December 30, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
December 29, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joseph M Gonzales by John Henry Wickert (Wickert, John)
December 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wickert, John)
December 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joseph M Gonzales; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16568862. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint)(Wickert, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Todays Growth Consultant, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph M Gonzales
Represented By: John Henry Wickert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todays Growth Consultant, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Melanie Damian
Represented By: Kevin Buckley Duff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?