Auston Transfer & Processing, LLC et al v. Shredderhotline.com Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Auston Transfer & Processing, LLC and Auston Contracting, Inc
Defendant: Shredderhotline.com Company, Inc., Dan Scott Burda and Shredderhotline.com Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv08506
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendants Dan Scott Burda, Shredderhotline.com Company. (pj, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 5/8/2020 at 09:45 AM. Rule 26(f) planning report re MIDP due 5/5/2020. The report shall comply with the requirements of the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg)
January 8, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Dan Scott Burda, Shredderhotline.com Company (txl, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Auston Contracting, Inc, Auston Transfer & Processing, LLC by John J. Oleary (Oleary, John)
December 31, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kl, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 ENTERED in Error. (Oleary, John) Modified on 1/2/2020 (smm, ).
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Oleary, John)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Auston Transfer & Processing, LLC, Auston Contracting, Inc; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16572229.(Oleary, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auston Transfer & Processing, LLC et al v. Shredderhotline.com Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shredderhotline.com Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Scott Burda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shredderhotline.com Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auston Transfer & Processing, LLC
Represented By: John J. Oleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auston Contracting, Inc
Represented By: John J. Oleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?