Hahn et al v. Gardner Grade School District No. 72 et al
Plaintiff: David Hahn and Melissa Hahn
Defendant: Illinois State Board of Education and Gardner Grade School District No. 72
Case Number: 1:2020cv00075
Filed: January 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 3/6/2020. Status hearing set for 3/12/2020 at 9:30 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Gardner Grade School District No. 72 by Emily Plomgren Bothfeld (Bothfeld, Emily)
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Gardner Grade School District No. 72 by Caroline A. Roselli (Roselli, Caroline)
January 6, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
January 5, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs David Hahn, Melissa Hahn by Pamela R Cleary (Cleary, Pamela)
January 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Cleary, Pamela)
January 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW filed by David Hahn, Melissa Hahn; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16582214. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A to Complaint)(Cleary, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hahn et al v. Gardner Grade School District No. 72 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hahn
Represented By: Pamela R Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Hahn
Represented By: Pamela R Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois State Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Grade School District No. 72
Represented By: Emily Plomgren Bothfeld
Represented By: Caroline A. Roselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?