Woodforest National Bank v. Hoyne Savings Bank
Plaintiff: Woodforest National Bank
Defendant: Hoyne Savings Bank
Case Number: 1:2020cv00193
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Woodforest National Bank. (Kozlowski, Michael)
March 5, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Service Notice of Service of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses of Defendant by Timothy Scott Breems on behalf of Hoyne Savings Bank (Breems, Timothy)
February 5, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hoyne Savings Bank by Scott Nelson (Nelson, Scott)
February 5, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hoyne Savings Bank by Paul Neil Reidy (Reidy, Paul)
February 5, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hoyne Savings Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Breems, Timothy)
February 5, 2020 Filing 11 FRCP 7.1 and LR32 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendant by Hoyne Savings Bank (Breems, Timothy)
February 5, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hoyne Savings Bank by Timothy Scott Breems (Breems, Timothy)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Joint status report due by 3/16/2020. Status hearing set for 3/20/2020 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/31/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Woodforest National Bank regarding Summons and Complaint served on Hoyne Savings Bank on January 17, 2020 (Kozlowski, Michael)
January 13, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Woodforest National Bank by Michael Stephan Kozlowski, Jr (Kozlowski, Michael)
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Woodforest National Bank by Esther C. Yahnig (Yahnig, Esther)
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Woodforest National Bank by Christopher J. Esbrook (Esbrook, Christopher)
January 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
January 10, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Hoyne Savings Bank (txl, )
January 10, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Esbrook, Christopher)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Woodforest National Bank (Esbrook, Christopher)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Woodforest National Bank; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16603667.(Esbrook, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodforest National Bank v. Hoyne Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoyne Savings Bank
Represented By: Paul Neil Reidy
Represented By: Scott Nelson
Represented By: Timothy Scott Breems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woodforest National Bank
Represented By: Christopher J. Esbrook
Represented By: Esther C. Yahnig
Represented By: Michael Stephan Kozlowski, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?