Harper v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: RUSSELL HARPER, as attorney-in-fact for Doreen Bebbington
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,
Case Number: 1:2020cv00391
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Dckt. No. #17 ) is hereby granted. The deadline to answer or otherwise plead is extended to March 6, 2020. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Hale Claydon for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #17 before Honorable Steven C. Seeger on 3/3/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Claydon, Jonathan)
February 21, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. for extension of time to file answer regarding notice of removal #1 (Unopposed) (Claydon, Jonathan)
February 7, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer of Otherwise Plead (Dckt. No. #14 ) is hereby granted. The Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by February 21, 2020. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Hale Claydon for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #14 before Honorable Steven C. Seeger on 2/18/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Claydon, Jonathan)
February 7, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. for extension of time to file answer regarding notice of removal #1 (Claydon, Jonathan)
February 6, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Russell Harper by Zachariah Joseph Snyder Refiling appearance per clerk request (Snyder, Zachariah)
February 4, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Russell Harper by Zachariah Joseph Snyder (Snyder, Zachariah)
January 31, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status hearing is set for April 1, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. At least two weeks before the hearing, the parties must discuss settlement in good faith, and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. The parties also must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court before the initial status hearing. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) by March 27, 2020. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. Second, the parties must submit a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Please note that the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report on the Court's docket, but must email (i.e., not file on the docket) the proposed Scheduling Order to the Court's proposed order inbox. The initial status hearing will be the scheduling conference contemplated by Rule 16(b). Lead counsel for the parties must participate in the initial status conference. Counsel must be prepared to discuss the status of settlement, as well as the proposed discovery plan. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process by one week before the initial status hearing, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status hearing. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 10 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel, Nathan H. Lichtenstein. (jh, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Dckt. No. #6 ) is hereby granted. Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by February 7, 2020. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Hale Claydon for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #6 before Honorable Steven C. Seeger on 1/23/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Claydon, Jonathan)
January 17, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., for extension of time to file answer regarding notice of removal #1 (Claydon, Jonathan)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., by David Stephen Repking (Repking, David)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., (Claydon, Jonathan)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., by Jonathan Hale Claydon (Claydon, Jonathan)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Claydon, Jonathan)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (19-CH-14328) filed by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16629511. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Claydon, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSSELL HARPER, as attorney-in-fact for Doreen Bebbington
Represented By: Nathan H. Lichtenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,
Represented By: David Stephen Repking
Represented By: Jonathan Hale Claydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?