Republic Technologies (NA), LLC et al v. NAJM Inc et al
Plaintiff: REPUBLIC TECHNOLOGIES (NA), LLC and SREAM, INC
Defendant: NAJM INC and NADIA Z. KHAWAR
Case Number: 1:2020cv00429
Filed: January 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:In light of Amended General Order 20-0012, the 3/19/2020 hearing #4 is stricken and re-set to 4/14/2020 at 9:00 a.m. In the meantime, if any party would like to raise an issue with the court, that party should send an email briefly explaining the issue to at Jackie_Deanes@ilnd.uscourts.gov and our proposed order email box at Proposed_Order_Feinerman@ilnd.uscourts.gov, with a copy to all other counsel, and the court will respond as soon as practicable.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Given the COVID-19 situation, counsel and pro se parties are strongly encouraged to appear telephonically at hearings scheduled for the week of 3/16/2020. The Toll Free call-in number is 877-336-1828, and the Access Code is 4082461. Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute until your case is called. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing set for 3/10/2020 #7 having been entered in error is vacated.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 3/10/2020 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 29, 2020 Filing 6 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (ph, )
January 29, 2020 Filing 5 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments) (ph, )
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 3/19/2020 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Gary Feinerman for all further proceedings. Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/24/20. (kp, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, )
January 21, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
January 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages filed by REPUBLIC TECHNOLOGIES (NA), LLC, SREAM, INC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16632890. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Langone, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Republic Technologies (NA), LLC et al v. NAJM Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAJM INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NADIA Z. KHAWAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REPUBLIC TECHNOLOGIES (NA), LLC
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SREAM, INC
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?