REPUBLIC TECHNOLOGIES (NA), LLC et al v. TAWAKAL II ENTERPRISES, INC. d/b/a COUNTRY TOBACCO OF YORKVILLE et al
Plaintiff: REPUBLIC TECHNOLOGIES (NA), LLC and SREAM, INC
Defendant: WALEED MUKHTAR and TAWAKAL II ENTERPRISES, INC. d/b/a COUNTRY TOBACCO OF YORKVILLE
Case Number: 1:2020cv00430
Filed: January 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing set for 3/20/2020 is stricken and reset to 5/6/2020 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs REPUBLIC TECHNOLOGIES (NA), LLC, SREAM, INC by Christopher V. Langone (Langone, Christopher)
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (aee, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (Attachments: #1 Trademarks)(aee, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Status hearing is set for 3/20/2020 at 9:00 AM. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendants of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 21, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
January 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages filed by REPUBLIC TECHNOLOGIES (NA), LLC, SREAM, INC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16632899. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Langone, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REPUBLIC TECHNOLOGIES (NA), LLC et al v. TAWAKAL II ENTERPRISES, INC. d/b/a COUNTRY TOBACCO OF YORKVILLE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALEED MUKHTAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAWAKAL II ENTERPRISES, INC. d/b/a COUNTRY TOBACCO OF YORKVILLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REPUBLIC TECHNOLOGIES (NA), LLC
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SREAM, INC
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?