Mutnick v. Clearview AI, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Mutnick
Defendant: Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz and Hoan Ton-That
Case Number: 1:2020cv00512
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant CDW's unopposed motion for extension of time to filed responsive pleading #26 is granted. Responsive pleading to be filed by 5/14/2020. No appearance necessary on 3/11/2020. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Motion by Joseph A. Strubbe for presentment of extension of time #26 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 3/11/2020 at 08:45 AM. (Strubbe, Joseph)
March 5, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION by Defendant CDW Government LLC for extension of time [Unopposed] (Strubbe, Joseph)
February 25, 2020 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 2/25/2020. Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Hoan Ton-That, and Richard Schwartz's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #19 is granted. Responsive pleadings to be filed by 5/14/2020. Attorneys Michael W. Ross and Lee Wolosky's motion for leave to proceed pro hac vice #22 , #23 are granted. Status hearing set for 3/23/2020 is stricken and reset to 5/15/2020 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 24 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by CDW Government LLC (Strubbe, Joseph)
February 18, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16734559. (on behalf of Clearview AI, Inc., Hoan Ton-That; Richard Schwartz) (Wolosky, Lee)
February 18, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16734476. (on behalf of Clearview AI, Inc.; Hoan Ton-That; Richard Schwartz) (Ross, Michael)
February 14, 2020 Filing 21 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Clearview AI, Inc. (Saunders, David)
February 14, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by David Prescott Saunders for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer,, motion for miscellaneous relief, #19 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/25/2020 at 08:45 AM. (Saunders, David)
February 14, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That for extension of time to file answer , MOTION by Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That to Adjourn Status Hearing / Unopposed Motion of Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Hoan Ton-That, and Richard Schwartz for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead and to Adjourn Status Hearing (Saunders, David)
February 14, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That by David Prescott Saunders (Saunders, David)
February 14, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by David Mutnick. Hoan Ton-That waiver sent on 2/13/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Kanovitz, Michael)
February 14, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by David Mutnick. Clearview AI, Inc. waiver sent on 2/13/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Kanovitz, Michael)
February 14, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant CDW Government LLC's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #13 is granted. Responsive pleading to be filed by 3/20/2020. No appearance necessary on 2/18/2020. Mailed notice. (ym, )
February 12, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Joseph A. Strubbe for presentment of extension of time #13 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/18/2020 at 08:45 AM. (Strubbe, Joseph)
February 12, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant CDW Government LLC for extension of time [Unopposed] (Strubbe, Joseph)
February 12, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CDW Government LLC by Zachary J Watters (Watters, Zachary)
February 12, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CDW Government LLC by Brian W. Ledebuhr (Ledebuhr, Brian)
February 12, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CDW Government LLC by Joseph A. Strubbe (Strubbe, Joseph)
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Mutnick as to Richard Schwartz on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (Drury, Scott)
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Mutnick by Scott Robert Drury (Drury, Scott)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Mutnick as to CDW Government LLC on 1/31/2020, answer due 2/21/2020. (Kanovitz, Michael)
January 30, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant CDW Government LLC (daj, )
January 29, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED complaint by David Mutnick against All Defendants (Drury, Scott)
January 24, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Clearview AI, Inc., Richard Schwartz, Hoan Ton-That (txl, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Mutnick by Arthur R. Loevy (Loevy, Arthur)
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Mutnick by Jonathan I. Loevy (Loevy, Jonathan)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Mutnick by Michael I Kanovitz (Kanovitz, Michael)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Status hearing is set for 3/23/2020 at 9:00 AM. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendants of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 22, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lw, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by David Mutnick; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Drury, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mutnick v. Clearview AI, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearview AI, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoan Ton-That
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mutnick
Represented By: Scott Robert Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?