Republic Technologies (NA), LLC et al v. 14th Avenue Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Republic Technologies (NA), LLC and Sream, Inc
Defendant: Abu Shamat Nawzat and 14th Avenue Corporation d/b/a Bilo Smoke
Case Number: 1:2020cv00514
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The status hearing on 3/25/20 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. The court will enter a scheduling order in response to the initial status report, which must be filed no later than 4/6/20. Notices mailed. (psm, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 18, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Sream, Inc. Abu Shamat Nawzat waiver sent on 1/29/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Langone, Christopher)
February 18, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Sream, Inc. 14th Avenue Corporation waiver sent on 1/29/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Langone, Christopher)
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 3/25/20 at 9:30 a.m. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (pk, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 4 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(pk, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
January 22, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lw, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Sream, Inc by Christopher V. Langone (Langone, Christopher)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages filed by Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Sream, Inc; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16642888. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Langone, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Republic Technologies (NA), LLC et al v. 14th Avenue Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abu Shamat Nawzat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 14th Avenue Corporation d/b/a Bilo Smoke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republic Technologies (NA), LLC
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?