Republic Technologies (NA), LLC et al v. Kin Smokes Shop Inc d/b/a Smoke For Less
Plaintiff: Republic Technologies (NA), LLC and Sream, Inc
Defendant: Kinnar Patel and Kin Smokes Shop Inc d/b/a Smoke For Less
Case Number: 1:2020cv00542
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER In light of the public health situation, the Court encourages all parties and their counsel to take precautions, be reasonable, and use common sense in pending cases. In General Order No. 20-0012 dated March 16, 2020 (and amended on March 17), the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois extended all deadlines in civil cases by three weeks. Parties should assume that this Court will accommodate reasonable requests for extensions in the coming weeks, and counsel should show flexibility and accommodate each other too. This Court will grant a six-week extension of fact discovery if requested (and there is no need for an immediate request). Parties should not take depositions before April 17 unless (1) they take place telephonically; and (2) all parties and the witness(es) consent. Even a telephonic deposition often requires an in-person meeting to prepare the witness, so telephonic depositions can go forward only if everyone agrees. If any party or witness wants a deposition to take place in person, the deposition will take place after April 17. Needless to say, that date may change as the public health situation continues to evolve. Parties should continue to make progress in their cases when possible, but in a manner that is consistent with public health and safety. In the meantime, continue to work together cooperatively in the best traditions of our shared profession. The Court thanks all parties and their counsel for their patience and understanding during this difficult time.Signed by the Honorable Steven C. Seeger on 3/18/2020: Mailed notice. (docket1, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
January 31, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status hearing is set for April 7, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. At least two weeks before the hearing, the parties must discuss settlement in good faith, and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. The parties also must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court before the initial status hearing. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) by April 2, 2020. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. Second, the parties must submit a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Please note that the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report on the Court's docket, but must email (i.e., not file on the docket) the proposed Scheduling Order to the Court's proposed order inbox. The initial status hearing will be the scheduling conference contemplated by Rule 16(b). Lead counsel for the parties must participate in the initial status conference. Counsel must be prepared to discuss the status of settlement, as well as the proposed discovery plan. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process by one week before the initial status hearing, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status hearing. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 E-MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (las, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 E-MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 exhibit)(las, )
January 23, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages filed by Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Sream, Inc; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16648090. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Langone, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Republic Technologies (NA), LLC et al v. Kin Smokes Shop Inc d/b/a Smoke For Less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinnar Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kin Smokes Shop Inc d/b/a Smoke For Less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republic Technologies (NA), LLC
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?