Atkins v. UPS Ground Freight Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Latonya Atkins
Defendant: UPS Ground Freight Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00573
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing on 3/31/20 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. The parties shall file a joint initial status report by 4/13/20. The court will enter a scheduling order in response. Notices mailed. (psm, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 27, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Latonya Atkins by C P Connors (Connors, C)
February 21, 2020 Filing 10 Defendants' Rule 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UPS Ground Freight Inc., United Parcel Service (Roesch, Charles)
February 21, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by UPS Ground Freight Inc., United Parcel Service (Roesch, Charles)
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants UPS Ground Freight Inc., United Parcel Service by Charles Matthew Roesch (Roesch, Charles)
February 19, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Latonya Atkins as to United Parcel Service on 1/31/2020, answer due 2/21/2020. (Faccenda, Michael)
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Latonya Atkins as to UPS Ground Freight Inc. on 1/31/2020, answer due 2/21/2020. (Faccenda, Michael)
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 3/31/20 at 9:30 a.m. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
January 28, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants UPS Ground Freight Inc., United Parcel Service (ec, )
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
January 24, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Latonya Atkins by Michael Anthony Faccenda (Faccenda, Michael)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Faccenda, Michael)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Latonya Atkins; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16653753.(Faccenda, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atkins v. UPS Ground Freight Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latonya Atkins
Represented By: Michael Anthony Faccenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPS Ground Freight Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?