Vance v. International Business Machines Corporation
Plaintiff: Steven Vance
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00577
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tim Janecyk by Nicholas Rudolph Lange (Lange, Nicholas)
March 13, 2020 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tim Janecyk by Gary F. Lynch (Lynch, Gary)
March 13, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tim Janecyk by Katrina Carroll (Carroll, Katrina)
March 12, 2020 Filing 19 Second AMENDED complaint by Steven Vance, Tim Janecyk against International Business Machines Corporation (Drury, Scott)
March 11, 2020 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2-27-2020 before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Order Number: 38173. Court Reporter Contact Information: Krista Burgeson, krista_burgeson@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-435-5567. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/1/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/9/2020. (Burgeson, Krista)
March 5, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing held. Plaintiff's consolidated complaint is due by 3/12/2020. Defendant is to answer or otherwise plead by 4/9/2020. Status hearing set for 3/31/2020 is reset to 4/14/2020 at 9:03 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
February 27, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. Motion for reassignment and consolidation #14 is granted. Status hearing set for 3/5/2020 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (vcf, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Kaitlin Patricia Sheehan for presentment of motion to consolidate cases #14 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 2/27/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Sheehan, Kaitlin)
February 20, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation to consolidate cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Janecyk Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Janecyk Notice of Removal)(Sheehan, Kaitlin)
February 6, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion to appear pro hac vice #12 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16687105. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Broome, Stephen)
February 4, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven Vance by Scott Robert Drury (Drury, Scott)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED complaint by Steven Vance against International Business Machines Corporation (Drury, Scott)
February 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by International Business Machines Corporation (Sheehan, Kaitlin)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant International Business Machines Corporation by Kaitlin Patricia Sheehan (Sheehan, Kaitlin)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant International Business Machines Corporation by Lazar Pol Raynal (Raynal, Lazar)
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Steven Vance. International Business Machines Corporation waiver sent on 1/31/2020, answer due 3/31/2020. (Kanovitz, Michael)
January 27, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven Vance by Arthur R. Loevy (Loevy, Arthur)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven Vance by Jonathan I. Loevy (Loevy, Jonathan)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven Vance by Michael I Kanovitz (Kanovitz, Michael)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Steven Vance; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Drury, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vance v. International Business Machines Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Vance
Represented By: Arthur R. Loevy
Represented By: Scott Robert Drury
Represented By: Jonathan I. Loevy
Represented By: Michael I Kanovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?