Gutierrez Garcia v. Rodriguez
Plaintiff: Jose Gutierrez Garcia
Defendant: Juan Rodriguez
Case Number: 1:2020cv00717
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff Jose Gutierrez Garcia's application to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. No. 4) is denied. The Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff has 30 days to file an Amended Complaint that states a claim upon which relief can be granted or this matter will be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 2/28/2020:Mailed notice(maf)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Jose Gutierrez Garcia for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Cruz, Kevin)
February 3, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jose Gutierrez Garcia by Kevin Carmichael Cruz (Cruz, Kevin)
January 31, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Cruz, Kevin)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED COMPLAINT filed by Jose Gutierrez Garcia; Jury Demand. (Cruz, Kevin) Modified on 2/3/2020 (kp, ). (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez Garcia v. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Gutierrez Garcia
Represented By: Kevin Carmichael Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?