BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. KMH Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Defendant: KMH Systems, Inc.
Receiver: Sandor Jacobson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00740
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Receiver Sandor Jacobson by Adam Phillip Silverman (Silverman, Adam)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Based upon Amended General Order 20-0012, status hearing previously set for 3/19/2020 is reset to 5/5/2020 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (vcf, )
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM RECEIVER. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 3/3/2020. Motion and status hearing held. Motions to withdraw #13 and #15 are granted. Attorneys Richard Drake and Rosanne Ciambrone are withdrawn as counsel. BMO Harris Bank's N.A.'s motion to appoint receiver #5 is granted. Status hearing is set for 3/19/2020 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice(vcf, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Richard Patrick Darke for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney, #15 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 3/3/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Darke, Richard)
February 24, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION by Attorney Richard P. Darke to withdraw as attorney for KMH Systems, Inc.. New address information: 646 S. Arthur Street, Arlington Heights, Illinois 60005 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notification of Party Contact Information)(Darke, Richard)
February 24, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Rosanne Ciambrone for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney, #13 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 3/3/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Ciambrone, Rosanne)
February 24, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION by Attorney Rosanne Ciambrone to withdraw as attorney for KMH Systems, Inc.. New address information: KMH Systems, Inc, 646 S. Arthur Street, Arlington Heights, Illinois 60005 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notification of Party Contact Information)(Ciambrone, Rosanne)
February 20, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant KMH Systems, Inc. by Richard Patrick Darke (Darke, Richard)
February 19, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank N.A. as to KMH Systems, Inc. on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Sullivan, James)
February 18, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. BMO Harris Bank N.A.'s motion to appoint receiver #5 is entered and continued. Status hearing set for 3/3/2020 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
February 18, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant KMH Systems, Inc. by Rosanne Ciambrone filed on behalf of Richard P. Darke (Ciambrone, Rosanne)
February 18, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant KMH Systems, Inc. by Rosanne Ciambrone (Ciambrone, Rosanne)
February 4, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank N.A. by Bryan E. Jacobson (Jacobson, Bryan)
February 3, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant KMH Systems, Inc. (acm, )
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by James Patrick Sullivan for presentment of motion to appoint receiver #5 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 2/18/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Sullivan, James)
February 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank N.A. to appoint receiver (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Sullivan, James)
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Sullivan, James)
January 31, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank N.A. by James Patrick Sullivan (Sullivan, James)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sullivan, James)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16677626. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Sullivan, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. KMH Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KMH Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Rosanne Ciambrone
Represented By: Richard Patrick Darke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: James Patrick Sullivan
Represented By: Bryan E. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Sandor Jacobson
Represented By: Adam Phillip Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?