Jones v. JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Plaintiff: William Jones
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00747
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 GENERAL ORDER signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: In view of the current situation regarding COVID19, the Court encourages counsel with motion or status hearings set over the next few weeks to (a) file a joint status report if they believe that the motion and/or status can be handled without an appearance simply by providing the Court with an update on the progress of the case or an indication that the relief requested in the motion either is unopposed or can be addressed with an agreed briefing schedule or (b) make arrangements to appear by telephone for all motions and status hearings that cannot be handled without an appearance. If you would like to appear by telephone for any hearing or status conference, please contact the Courtroom Deputy, Lynn Kandziora, preferably by email (Lynn_Kandziora@ilnd.uscourts.gov) or by telephone (312) 4085153, if necessary, to advise her of the case number and the name of the person who is expecting to participate. We will open the phone lines shortly before the start time every day that court is in session. Please use the Court's toll free call in number 877 848 7030, conference access code is 2413900. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, we ask that you keep your phone on mute until your case is called. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 3/13/2020: Mailed notice. (rp, )
March 10, 2020 Filing 15 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by JPMorgan Chase & Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rollinson, Taylor)
March 10, 2020 Filing 14 Defendant's ANSWER to amended complaint by JPMorgan Chase & Co.(Rollinson, Taylor)
February 25, 2020 Filing 13 First AMENDED complaint by William Jones against JPMorgan Chase & Co. (Levin, David)
February 21, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant's Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #9 is granted. Answer shall be due by 3/10/2020. Motion hearing set for 3/2/2020 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JPMorgan Chase & Co. by Thomas Elliott Deer (Deer, Thomas)
February 19, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Taylor Nicole Rollinson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #9 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 3/2/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Rollinson, Taylor)
February 19, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant JPMorgan Chase & Co. for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Unopposed) (Rollinson, Taylor)
February 19, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JPMorgan Chase & Co. by Taylor Nicole Rollinson (Rollinson, Taylor)
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Jones as to JPMorgan Chase & Co. on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (Levin, David)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 4/9/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 4/6/2020. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
February 3, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant JPMorgan Chase & Co. (acm, )
January 31, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff William Jones by Todd M Friedman (Friedman, Todd)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff William Jones by Steven Gene Perry (Perry, Steven)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff William Jones by David B. Levin (Levin, David)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by William Jones; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16678662. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Levin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Jones
Represented By: David B. Levin
Represented By: Steven Gene Perry
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Thomas Elliott Deer
Represented By: Taylor Nicole Rollinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?