Williams v. County of Cook et al
Plaintiff: Damon Charles Williams
Defendant: County of Cook and Joseph Berrios
Case Number: 1:2020cv00759
Filed: February 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 10 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Mailed notice(lk, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Case is dismissed due to Petitioner's failure to pay filing fee as directed in Minute Entry #7 dated 2/21/2020. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (lk, )
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 GENERAL ORDER signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: In view of the current situation regarding COVID19, the Court encourages counsel with motion or status hearings set over the next few weeks to (a) file a joint status report if they believe that the motion and/or status can be handled without an appearance simply by providing the Court with an update on the progress of the case or an indication that the relief requested in the motion either is unopposed or can be addressed with an agreed briefing schedule or (b) make arrangements to appear by telephone for all motions and status hearings that cannot be handled without an appearance. If you would like to appear by telephone for any hearing or status conference, please contact the Courtroom Deputy, Lynn Kandziora, preferably by email (Lynn_Kandziora@ilnd.uscourts.gov) or by telephone (312) 4085153, if necessary, to advise her of the case number and the name of the person who is expecting to participate. We will open the phone lines shortly before the start time every day that court is in session. Please use the Court's toll free call in number 877 848 7030, conference access code is 2413900. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, we ask that you keep your phone on mute until your case is called. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 3/13/2020: Mailed notice. (rp, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. On February 4, 2020, Damon Charles Williams, in his capacity as fiduciary of the Estate of Solomon Williams, filed a petition in this Court pursuant to the Federal Arbitration Act seeking enforcement of an arbitration award entered by arbitrator Matthew Zarder against Cook County and Cook County Assessor Joseph Berrios on August 12, 2019. Petitioner also filed an application to proceed in forma pauperis #3 . Under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a), the Court is authorized to permit Williams to proceed in forma pauperis if he is unable to pay the mandated filing fee. The statute "is designed to ensure that indigent litigants have meaningful access to the federal courts." Neitzke v. Williams, 490 U.S. 319, 324 (1989). Williams is eligible to proceed in forma pauperis if paying the filing fee would prevent him from purchasing the necessities of life. Zaun v. Dobbin, 628 F.2d 990, 992 (7th Cir. 1980). Williams indicates that he makes $60,000 annually in self-employment income and that his spouse also earns $1,000 per month, or $12,000 per year. This brings their household income to $72,000 per year. He further indicates that there are three people who are dependent on him for support. For a household of four, $72,000 per year far exceeds the federal poverty guideline level for 2020, which is $26,200. Petitioner further indicates that he has $500 in a bank account. Given that his income far exceeds the poverty level, Petitioner has failed to demonstrate that paying the $400 filing fee would prevent him from purchasing the necessities of life. The Court denies the application to proceed in forma pauperis #3 . Petitioner must pay the mandated filing fee within two weeks of the entry of this order or his case will be summarily dismissed. Williams also filed a "motion to confirm arbitration award #4 ". This is not a proper motion, as it merely repeats the relief sought by the petition for enforcement of the arbitration award. The motion #4 is dismissed.Mailed notice (lk, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 4/22/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 4/17/2020. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Damon Charles Williams to confirm arbitration award (mc, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Damon Charles Williams for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (mc, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (mc, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 1 copy by Damon Charles Williams. (Exhibits). (mc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. County of Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Berrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Charles Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?