Phillips v. Saul
Plaintiff: NATASHA W. PHILLIPS
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv00866
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket13, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is granted. Plaintiff may proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If the parties wish to consent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge, a signed consent form should be filed promptly. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 2/24/2020. Mailed notice. (kp, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT filed by Natasha W. Phillips. (kp, )
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is granted. Plaintiff may proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If the parties wish to consent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge, a signed consent form should be filed promptly. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 2/21/2020. Mailed notice. (kp, )
February 6, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ecw, )
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff NATASHA W. PHILLIPS by Matthew Frederick Richter (Richter, Matthew)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION by Plaintiff NATASHA W. PHILLIPS for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Richter, Matthew)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED COMPLAINT filed by NATASHA W. PHILLIPS; (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richter, Matthew) Modified on 2/7/2020 (kp, ). (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATASHA W. PHILLIPS
Represented By: Matthew Frederick Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?