Bowden v. Rimsky et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Bowden
Defendant: Brian Schnier, City of Chicago, Nicholas Boyle and Robert Rimsky
Case Number: 1:2020cv00929
Filed: February 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, and pursuant to General Order 20-0012, as amended, the status hearing set for 4/7/2020 is vacated and reset to 5/19/2020 at 8:45 AM. The parties are directed to file, by no later than 4/14/2020, a joint status report including the following information: a description of each party's claims and defenses; details concerning any discussions regarding settlement; a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and any other matters the parties wish to bring to the Court's attention. This deadline will not be affected by General Order 20-0012, as amended, or any other similar orders entered hereafter. (mk)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket6, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Nicholas Boyle, Robert Rimsky, Brian Schnier by Nathan A. Shine (Shine, Nathan)
March 20, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Nicholas Boyle, Robert Rimsky, Brian Schnier by Emily Elizabeth Dory (Dory, Emily)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Stephanie Amanda Sotomayor (Sotomayor, Stephanie)
March 11, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time #7 is granted; responses to complaint are to be filed by 4/3/2020. (mk)
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED NOTICE of Motion by Marques Alan Berrington for presentment of extension of time #7 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/12/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Berrington, Marques)
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant City of Chicago for extension of time Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time for All Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Berrington, Marques)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Marques Alan Berrington (Berrington, Marques)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 4/7/2020 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant who has not yet appeared by counsel in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. (mk)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Bowden as to Nicholas Boyle on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020; City of Chicago on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Robert Rimsky on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020; Brian Schnier on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (Garber, Sara)
February 10, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
February 9, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patrick Bowden by Alexander Stein (Stein, Alexander)
February 9, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patrick Bowden by Sara A Garber (Garber, Sara)
February 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Patrick Bowden; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16705448. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Garber, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowden v. Rimsky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Schnier
Represented By: Nathan A. Shine
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Dory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Represented By: Marques Alan Berrington
Represented By: Stephanie Amanda Sotomayor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Boyle
Represented By: Nathan A. Shine
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Dory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Rimsky
Represented By: Nathan A. Shine
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Dory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Bowden
Represented By: Alexander Stein
Represented By: Sara A Garber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?