Nunes v. HNI Risk Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Nunes
Defendant: Acrisure LLC and HNI Risk Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01067
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket12, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 27, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ronald Nunes by C P Connors (Connors, C)
February 25, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Acrisure LLC, HNI Risk Services LLC by Tom H. Luetkemeyer (Luetkemeyer, Tom)
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Acrisure LLC, HNI Risk Services LLC by Thaddeus A Harrell (Harrell, Thaddeus)
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ronald Nunes. Acrisure LLC waiver sent on 2/21/2020, answer due 4/21/2020. (Faccenda, Michael)
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ronald Nunes. HNI Risk Services LLC waiver sent on 2/21/2020, answer due 4/21/2020. (Faccenda, Michael)
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 4/16/2020 at 1:30 p.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 4/9/2020. Mailed notice (rj, )
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, )
February 13, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jg, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ronald Nunes by Michael Anthony Faccenda (Faccenda, Michael)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Faccenda, Michael)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint filed by Ronald Nunes; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16724425.(Faccenda, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunes v. HNI Risk Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acrisure LLC
Represented By: Thaddeus A Harrell
Represented By: Tom H. Luetkemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HNI Risk Services LLC
Represented By: Thaddeus A Harrell
Represented By: Tom H. Luetkemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Nunes
Represented By: Michael Anthony Faccenda
Represented By: C P Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?