Union Pacific Railroad Company v. International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Defendant: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division
Case Number: 1:2020cv01139
Filed: February 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket8, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division by Kevin C. Brodar (Brodar, Kevin)
March 26, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division by Shawn Mckinley (Mckinley, Shawn)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Union Pacific Railroad Company as to International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (Glenn, Jeremy)
February 25, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division (dxb, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16747133. (Hawkins, Robert)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16746791. (Rolfes, Andrew)
February 18, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ecw, )
February 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Glenn, Jeremy)
February 15, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Company by Jeremy J. Glenn (Glenn, Jeremy)
February 15, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Glenn, Jeremy)
February 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16732247. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Glenn, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union Pacific Railroad Company v. International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division
Represented By: Shawn Mckinley
Represented By: Kevin C. Brodar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Jeremy J. Glenn
Represented By: Robert S. Hawkins
Represented By: Andrew J. Rolfes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?