Tarter et al v. Medline Industries
Plaintiff: Susan Tarter and Robert Tarter
Defendant: Inc Medline Industries and Medline Industries
Case Number: 1:2020cv01140
Filed: February 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Medline Industries(Firnstein, Margaret)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket5, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle:Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #4 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, March 13, 2020. An Agreed Written Status Report is due on 6/5/2020. Mailed notice (ewf, )
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion by Margaret Christina Firnstein for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #4 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 3/13/2020 at 10:30 AM. (Firnstein, Margaret)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Defendant Medline Industries for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Firnstein, Margaret)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Medline Industries by Margaret Christina Firnstein (Firnstein, Margaret)
February 18, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ecw, )
February 16, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Robert Tarter, Susan Tarter by Christopher V. Langone (Langone, Christopher)
February 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Robert Tarter, Susan Tarter; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16732336. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Langone, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tarter et al v. Medline Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Tarter
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Tarter
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inc Medline Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medline Industries
Represented By: Margaret Christina Firnstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?