Fritkin v. JD Transportation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael K Fritkin
Defendant: JD Transportation, Inc. and Jason Michael Freeman
Case Number: 1:2020cv01193
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The parties have filed a stipulation for dismissal with prejudice. Based on this, plaintiff's motion to remand #12 is terminated without prejudice. There is, however, a problem with the stipulation for dismissal as worded. It purports to dismiss the case with prejudice but states that "[t]he Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the settlement and adjudicate any liens." The parties are advised that controlling Seventh Circuits authority does not permit a court to retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement if a case is dismissed with prejudice (retaining jurisdiction to enforce liens is likely a different matter). If the parties are unable to dismiss the case with prejudice without a retention of jurisdiction, for example, because the settlement contemplates payment over time or at a future date, the Court suggests that they file a stipulation for dismissal without prejudice, to convert to a dismissal with prejudice as of a specific date unless a motion for reinstatement is filed. The Court will defer entry of a dismissal order pending the parties' filing of a revised stipulation. (mk)
April 17, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal (White, Bryan)
April 10, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE by JD Transportation, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Michael K Fritkin to remand (Amended) #12 Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Remand (Clarke, Michael)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket4, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The motion hearing set for 4/7/2020 and the status hearing set for 4/9/2020 are vacated. Plaintiff's original motion to remand #10 is terminated as moot based on the filing of an amended motion. Defendants are directed to file a response to the amended motion to remand by 4/10/2020, and plaintiff is directed to file a reply to the response by 4/17/2020. These dates are unaffected by General Rule 20-0012, and the Court directs that they will not be affected by any order similar to General Order 20-0012 entered hereafter. Ruling and status hearing before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly set for 4/27/2020 at 9:30 AM. (mk)
March 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Wayne White for presentment of motion to remand #12 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/7/2020 at 09:30 AM. (White, Bryan)
March 23, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Michael K Fritkin to remand (Amended) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(White, Bryan)
March 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Bryan Wayne White for presentment of motion to remand #10 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/7/2020 at 09:30 AM. (White, Bryan)
March 19, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Michael K Fritkin to remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(White, Bryan)
March 19, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael K Fritkin by Bryan Wayne White (White, Bryan)
March 19, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael K Fritkin by James J. O'Hagan (O'Hagan, James)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 4/9/2020 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. (mk)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (pk, )
February 19, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I. Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jason Michael Freeman, JD Transportation, Inc. by Michael James Mullen (Mullen, Michael)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jason Michael Freeman, JD Transportation, Inc. by Michael T. Clarke (Clarke, Michael)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Clarke, Michael)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2018L010022) filed by Jason Michael Freeman, JD Transportation, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16739878. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Excerpts of Deposition Transcript)(Clarke, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fritkin v. JD Transportation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JD Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Michael James Mullen
Represented By: Michael T. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Michael Freeman
Represented By: Michael James Mullen
Represented By: Michael T. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael K Fritkin
Represented By: Bryan Wayne White
Represented By: James J. O'Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?