Ledbetter v. Oak Park River Forest High School et al
Plaintiff: Christian Ledbetter
Defendant: Nathaniel Rouse, John Stelzer and Oak Park River Forest High School
Case Number: 1:2020cv01219
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan H Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket13, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Response to the motion to dismiss #13 is due by 4/1/2020; reply by 4/15/2020. Motion hearing set for 3/18/2020 is stricken. Mailed notice (ags)
March 11, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Tyler Jon Bohman for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #13 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 3/18/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Bohman, Tyler)
March 11, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by Nathaniel Rouse, John Stelzer in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #13 Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) (Bohman, Tyler)
March 11, 2020 Filing 13 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Nathaniel Rouse, John Stelzer Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) (Bohman, Tyler)
March 11, 2020 Filing 12 Defendant, Oak Park River Forest H.S. District 200's ANSWER to Complaint at Law and Affirmative Defenses by Oak Park River Forest High School(Bohman, Tyler)
February 27, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Motion for extension of time #9 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 3/11/2020. Motion hearing set for 3/11/2020 is stricken. Mailed notice (ags)
February 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Frank Bennett Garrett, III for presentment of extension of time, #9 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 3/11/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Garrett, Frank)
February 26, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendants Oak Park River Forest High School, Nathaniel Rouse, John Stelzer for extension of time Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint at Law (Garrett, Frank)
February 21, 2020 MIDP NOTICE: This case has been reassigned to a judge that is not participating in the MIDP Program therefore, this case is no longer part of MIDP Program regarding #8 (pj, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow for all further proceedings. Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr no longer assigned to the case, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a) and (b)(1). Signed by Executive Committee on 2/21/2020. (pj, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to all counsel on record. (kp, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Oak Park River Forest High School, Nathaniel Rouse, John Stelzer by Tyler Jon Bohman (Bohman, Tyler)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Oak Park River Forest High School, Nathaniel Rouse, John Stelzer by Frank Bennett Garrett, III (Garrett, Frank)
February 20, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Removal from Cook County, case number (2019 L 014120) filed by Oak Park River Forest High School, Nathaniel Rouse, John Stelzer Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16743101. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Garrett, Frank)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 PAYMENT of Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16743060. (Garrett, Frank)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Garrett, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledbetter v. Oak Park River Forest High School et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel Rouse
Represented By: Tyler Jon Bohman
Represented By: Frank Bennett Garrett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stelzer
Represented By: Tyler Jon Bohman
Represented By: Frank Bennett Garrett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oak Park River Forest High School
Represented By: Tyler Jon Bohman
Represented By: Frank Bennett Garrett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Ledbetter
Represented By: Thomas Cusack Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?