Veljkovic v. Board of Education of the City of Chicago
Plaintiff: Daniela Veljkovic
Defendant: Board of Education of the City of Chicago
Case Number: 1:2020cv01551
Filed: March 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Pursuant to Second Amended General Order 20-0012, the 4/20/2020 status hearing #5 is stricken and re-set for 5/19/2020 at 9:00 a.m. In the meantime, if any party wishes to present a scheduling or other issue or question to the court, that party should send an email to the Courtroom Deputy (Jackie_Deanes@ilnd.uscourts.gov) and the proposed order email box (Proposed_Order_Feinerman@ilnd.uscourts.gov), with a copy to all other counsel, and the court will respond as soon as practicable. If any party wishes to extend, shorten, or revoke in a particular case the filing extensions granted by Paragraph 2 of Second Amended General Order 20-0012, that party shall file a motion on the case docket and shall indicate in the motion whether the relief sought is agreed or opposed. Parties may file other non-emergency motions on the case docket as they see fit. Emergency relief in any case, or emergency relief from Second Amended General Order 20-0012, shall be sought in the manner set forth in Paragraphs 5-6 of Second Amended General Order 20-0012.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket4, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (tg, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 4/20/2020 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (rc, )
March 4, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lw, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Daniela Veljkovic by Elaine K.B. Siegel (Siegel, Elaine)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Siegel, Elaine)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Daniela Veljkovic; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16791751. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Siegel, Elaine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veljkovic v. Board of Education of the City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniela Veljkovic
Represented By: Elaine K.B. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of the City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?