Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection v. Fifth Third Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank, N.A.
Intervenor: Heavy & General Laborers' Local 472 & 172 Pension and Annuity Funds
Case Number: 1:2020cv01683
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 2/12/2021. Mailed notice (dal, )
February 12, 2021 Filing 55 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, Defendant's motion to transfer venue #20 is granted. This Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio. The remaining motions pending on this Court's docket, including the motion to intervene for the limited purpose of obtaining access to improperly redacted exhibits filed on the public docket #43 , are terminated without prejudice to renewal in the transferee court. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (dal, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 54 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant Fifth Third Bank's motion for leave to file sur-reply in opposition to motion to intervene #53 is granted. The Court will consider the sur-reply attached as an exhibit to Defendant's motion [53-1]. Mailed notice (dal, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION by Defendant Fifth Third Bank, N.A. for leave to file Sur-Reply In Opposition to Motion to Intervene (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Sur-Reply)(Ferrara, Michael)
August 24, 2020 Filing 52 REPLY by Heavy & General Laborers' Local 472 & 172 Pension and Annuity Funds to MOTION by Plaintiff Heavy & General Laborers' Local 472 & 172 Pension and Annuity Funds, Intervenor Parties Heavy & General Laborers' Local 472 & 172 Pension and Annuity Funds, Heavy & General Laborers' Local 472 & 172 Pension and Annuity #43 Proposed Intervenor's Reply to Fifth Third Bank's Opposition to Motion to Intervene for Limited Purposer (Cochran, Brian)
August 18, 2020 Filing 51 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: The Court grants Defendant Fifth-Third Bank NA's unopposed e-mail request for an extension of time to respond to the complaint. Defendant's obligation to answer the complaint is suspended until after the Court's ruling on Defendant's pending motion to transfer venue #20 . Mailed notice (dal, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 50 RESPONSE by Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection to MOTION by Plaintiff Heavy & General Laborers' Local 472 & 172 Pension and Annuity Funds, Intervenor Parties Heavy & General Laborers' Local 472 & 172 Pension and Annuity Funds, Heavy & General Laborers' Local 472 & 172 Pension and Annuity #43 (Reiferson, Barry)
August 13, 2020 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM by Fifth Third Bank, N.A. in Opposition to motion to intervene, #43 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ryan Scarborough Fifth Third Bank's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Intervene)(Ferrara, Michael)
July 29, 2020 Filing 48 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic status and motion hearing held on 7/29/2020. Motion by counsel for leave to appear pro hac vice #47 is granted. The Court sets the following briefing schedule for Heavy & General Laborers' Local 472 & 172 Pension and Annuity Fund's motion to intervene for limited purpose of obtaining access to improperly redacted exhibits filed on the public docket #43 : Defendant and Plaintiff shall respond by 8/13/2020 and Intervenor shall reply by 8/24/2020. No further status date is set at this time. Mailed notice (dal, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17256653. (Kinnon, Christopher)
July 27, 2020 Filing 46 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic motion hearing set for 7/29/2020 at 9:30 AM regarding Plaintiff's motion to intervene for limited purpose of obtaining access to improperly redacted exhibits filed on the public docket. The call-in information at docket entry #42 remains the same. Mailed notice. (dal, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk8, Docket)
June 29, 2020 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION by Intervenor Heavy & General Laborers' Local 472 & 172 Pension and Annuity Funds to intervene FOR LIMITED PURPOSE OF OBTAINING ACCESS TO IMPROPERLY REDACTED EXHIBITS FILED ON THE PUBLIC DOCKET (Cochran, Brian) Docket text modified by Clerk's Office on 7/27/2020 (dal, ).
June 29, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION by Plaintiff Heavy & General Laborers' Local 472 & 172 Pension and Annuity Funds, Intervenor Parties Heavy & General Laborers' Local 472 & 172 Pension and Annuity Funds, Heavy & General Laborers' Local 472 & 172 Pension and Annuity Funds to intervene (Cochran, Brian)
June 26, 2020 Filing 42 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: On the Court's own motion, the initial status hearing set for 7/2/2020 is stricken and reset for a telephonic status hearing 7/29/2020 at 9:30 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (dal, )
June 1, 2020 Filing 41 REPLY by Fifth Third Bank, N.A. to memorandum in opposition to motion, #39 to transfer venue (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Stucky, #2 Declaration of Kenneth Oglesby)(Ferrara, Michael)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM by Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection in Opposition to motion to change venue #20 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Barry Reiferson, #2 Exhibit No. 1, #3 Exhibit No. 2, #4 Exhibit No. 3, #5 Exhibit No. 4, #6 Exhibit No. 5, #7 Exhibit No. 6, #8 Exhibit No. 7, #9 Exhibit No. 8, #10 Exhibit No. 9, #11 Exhibit No. 10)(Reiferson, Barry)
May 20, 2020 Filing 38 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection by Leanne Elizabeth Hartmann (Hartmann, Leanne)
May 20, 2020 Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection by Lane Chessin Powell (Powell, Lane)
May 20, 2020 Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection by Barry E Reiferson (Reiferson, Barry)
May 1, 2020 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Pursuant to the agreement of the parties, the Court extends the briefing schedule on Defendant's motion to transfer venue #20 as follows : Plaintiff shall respond by 5/22/2020 and Defendant shall reply by 6/1/2020. Mailed notice. (dal, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 33 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fifth Third Bank, N.A. by John K. Villa (Villa, John)
April 27, 2020 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion by counsel for leave to appear pro hac vice #28 is granted. Mailed notice. (dal, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 31 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection by Meghan Sherman Cater (Cater, Meghan)
April 21, 2020 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: The motion presentment hearing set for 5/6/2020 is stricken. No appearance is required. Mailed notice. (dal, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Pursuant to the agreement of the parties, the Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendant's motion to transfer venue #20 : Plaintiff shall respond by 5/8/2020 and Defendant shall reply by 5/18/2020. The parties' obligation to hold a Rule 26(f) planning conference is held in abeyance pending resolution of the motion to transfer. Initial status hearing set for 5/13/2020 #11 is stricken and reset for 7/2/2020 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (dal, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16944648. (Villa, John)
April 20, 2020 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fifth Third Bank, N.A. by Enu Abhilasha Mainigi (Mainigi, Enu)
April 20, 2020 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fifth Third Bank, N.A. by Yifan Wang (Wang, Yifan)
April 20, 2020 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fifth Third Bank, N.A. by Ryan Thomas Scarborough (Scarborough, Ryan)
April 20, 2020 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fifth Third Bank, N.A. by Jason J. Mendro (Mendro, Jason)
April 20, 2020 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fifth Third Bank, N.A. by Joshua M. Wesneski (Wesneski, Joshua)
April 20, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motions by counsel for leave to appear pro hac vice #6 , #7 , #8 , #9 , #15 , #16 , #17 , #18 , and #19 are granted. Mailed notice. (dal, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Michael James Ferrara for presentment of motion to change venue #20 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 5/6/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Ferrara, Michael)
April 20, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendant Fifth Third Bank, N.A. to change venue (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory Elmore in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue)(Ferrara, Michael)
April 20, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16942041. (Wang, Yifan)
April 20, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16941785. (Mainigi, Enu)
April 20, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16941717. (Scarborough, Ryan)
April 20, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16941698. (Mendro, Jason)
April 20, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16941670. (Wesneski, Joshua)
April 17, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fifth Third Bank, N.A. by Michael James Ferrara (Ferrara, Michael)
April 13, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. Fifth Third Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 4/9/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Olson, Mary)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket8, )
March 24, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Fifth Third Bank, N.A. (tg, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 5/13/2020 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (tg, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 9 (Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice) MOTION by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection for leave to appear as Counsel (Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Cater, Meghan) Modified on 3/12/2020 (las, ).
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection for leave to appear as Counsel, Pro Hac Vice (Powell, Lane) Modified on 3/12/2020 (las, ).
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection for leave to appear as Counsel, Pro Hac Vice (Hartmann, Leanne)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 (Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Barry Reiferson) MOTION by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection for leave to appear as Counsel (Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Barry Reiferson) (Reiferson, Barry)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection by Mary Elizabeth Olson (Olson, Mary)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection by Michael G. Salemi (Salemi, Michael)
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Salemi, Michael)
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection; (Salemi, Michael)
March 9, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection v. Fifth Third Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection
Represented By: Michael G. Salemi
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Olson
Represented By: Meghan Sherman Cater
Represented By: Lane Chessin Powell
Represented By: Barry E Reiferson
Represented By: Leanne Elizabeth Hartmann
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jason J. Mendro
Represented By: Joshua M. Wesneski
Represented By: Yifan Wang
Represented By: Enu Abhilasha Mainigi
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Scarborough
Represented By: Michael James Ferrara
Represented By: John K. Villa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Heavy & General Laborers' Local 472 & 172 Pension and Annuity Funds
Represented By: Brian E. Cochran
Represented By: Christopher R. Kinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?