Smith v. Ford Motor Co
Plaintiff: Cortez Smith
Defendant: Ford Motor Co
Case Number: 1:2020cv01769
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 MAILED plaintiff a copy of the order dated 5/1/2020 and the form Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs/Financial Affidavit (Non-Prisoner Case). (mc, )
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER : The Court has reviewed plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 , but plaintiff has not complete the Financial Affidavit. Plaintiff is directed to submit a completed Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs/Financial Affidavit (Non-Prisoner Case). The Clerk is directed to mail plaintiff a copy of this order and the form Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs/Financial Affidavit (Non-Prisoner Case). Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 5/1/2020. Mailed notice(mc, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket4, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (tg, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Cortez Smith for attorney representation (mc, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Cortez Smith (mc, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (mc, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Cortez Smith. (Exhibit). (mc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Ford Motor Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cortez Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?