CivCon Services, Inc. v. Accesso Services, LLC
Plaintiff: CivCon Services, Inc.
Defendant: Accesso Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01821
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Accesso Services, LLC by Robert Edward Entin (Entin, Robert)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 14, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CivCon Services, Inc. as to All Defendants. (Foster, Howard)
April 6, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff CivCon Services, Inc. by Aaron Ross Walner (Walner, Aaron)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER CORRECTED ENTRY: ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice...Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020:Mailed notice(docket7, )
March 27, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff CivCon Services, Inc. by Aaron Ross Walner of The Walner Law Firm,LLC (Walner, Aaron)
March 26, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Accesso Services, LLC (tg, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 5/21/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 5/18/2020. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
March 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (td, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff CIVCON Services, Inc. by Aaron Ross Walner (Walner, Aaron)
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff CIVCON Services, Inc. by Matthew A Galin (Galin, Matthew)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff CIVCON Services, Inc. by Howard William Foster (Foster, Howard)
March 18, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff CIVCON Services, Inc. by James B. Zouras (Zouras, James)
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff CIVCON Services, Inc. by Ryan F Stephan (Stephan, Ryan)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff CIVCON Services, Inc. by Anna Ceragioli (Ceragioli, Anna)
March 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ceragioli, Anna)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint filed by CIVCON Services, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16836513.(Ceragioli, Anna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CivCon Services, Inc. v. Accesso Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CivCon Services, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Represented By: Howard William Foster
Represented By: Aaron Ross Walner
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: Anna Ceragioli
Represented By: Matthew A Galin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accesso Services, LLC
Represented By: Robert Edward Entin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?