International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO v. Adamo Demolition Company
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO
Defendant: Adamo Demolition Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01871
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to dismiss #12 is entered and continued. Plaintiff shall respond to the motion by 6/12/2020; Defendant shall reply by 6/26/2020. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Adamo Demolition Company by Saif Riyadh Kasmikha (Kasmikha, Saif)
May 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Adamo Demolition Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-4 to Motion to Dismiss)(Kasmikha, Saif)
April 29, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Pursuant to Third Amended General Order 20-0012, the 5/7/2020 status hearing #7 is stricken and re-set to 6/2/2020 at 2:00 p.m. In the meantime, if any party wishes to present a procedural issue or question to the court, the party should send an email to the Courtroom Deputy (Jackie_Deanes@ilnd.uscourts.gov) and the proposed order email box (Proposed_Order_Feinerman@ilnd.uscourts.gov), with a copy to all other counsel and pro se parties, and the court will respond as soon as practicable. If any party wishes to extend, shorten, or revoke in a particular case an extension granted by Paragraph 2 of the Third Amended General Order or any prior iteration of General Order 20-0012, that party shall file a motion on the case docket pursuant to Paragraph 2.c of the Third Amended General Order, and shall indicate in the motion whether the relief sought is agreed or opposed. If any party believes that a telephonic hearing is necessary before 6/1/2020, that party shall file a motion under Paragraph 3 of the Third Amended General Order. Parties may file non-emergency motions on the case docket as they see fit. Emergency relief in any case, or emergency relief from the Third Amended General Order, shall be sought in the manner set forth in Paragraphs 7-8 of the Third Amended General Order.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket4, )
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service by Dale D. Pierson on behalf of International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO regarding Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot(MIDP),,, #6 (Pierson, Dale)
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 5/7/2020 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO as to Adamo Demolition Company on 3/20/2020, answer due 4/10/2020. (Pierson, Dale)
March 19, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Adamo Demolition Company (lma, )
March 19, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I. Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mc, )
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO by Robert A Paszta (Paszta, Robert)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO by Dale D. Pierson (Pierson, Dale)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Pierson, Dale)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16863632. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-I)(Pierson, Dale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO v. Adamo Demolition Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Robert A Paszta
Represented By: Dale D. Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adamo Demolition Company
Represented By: Saif Riyadh Kasmikha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?