Lowry et al v. RTI Surgical Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert P. Jordheim, Johannes W. Louw, Jonathon M. Singer, Brian K. Hutchison and Patricia Lowry
Defendant: Camille I. Farhat and RTI Surgical Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01939
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The motion of James Goldfarb to appear pro hac vice is granted. The joint motion for schedule to file an amended complaint and defendants' response is also granted. The Court agrees with plaintiff that the statutory (PSLRA) deadline for motions for appointment as lead plaintiff and for approval of lead plaintiff's selection of lead counsel are due on 5/22/2020. Defendants need not respond to the currently filed complaint. Within 45 days after entry of an order appointing lead plaintiff and lead counsel, lead plaintiff shall file an amended and/or consolidated complaint or notify defendants that plaintiff intends to rely on the initially filed complaint. Defendants will have 45 days after that to respond to the operative complaint. The remainder of any schedule on a motion to dismiss will be set after such a motion is filed. The case is set for a status hearing on 7/8/2020 at 9:30 AM. A joint status report is to be filed by 6/29/2020. (mk)
May 1, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16982472. (Goldfarb, James)
May 1, 2020 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Brian K. Hutchison by Alan M Wolper (Wolper, Alan)
April 30, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION by Defendant Robert P. Jordheim All Parties Joint Motion For Schedule to File Amended Complaint and Defendants Response Thereto (Meshulam, Deborah)
April 27, 2020 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion to appear pro hac vice for attorneys Allison Kernisky #12 , Louise McAlpin #13 , Stephen P. Warren #14 , Keara Gordon #17 and Deborah Meshulam #18 are granted. The motion hearing set for 4/28/2020 is vacated. Mailed notice. (mma, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Brian K. Hutchison by Stephen J Crimmins (Crimmins, Stephen)
April 23, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16951259. (Meshulam, Deborah)
April 23, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16951226. (Gordon, Keara)
April 23, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Robert P. Jordheim by Yan Grinblat (Grinblat, Yan)
April 23, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Martin G. Durkin for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice #12 , motion to appear pro hac vice #14 , motion to appear pro hac vice #13 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/28/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Durkin, Martin)
April 23, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16950698. (Stephen P. Warren) (Durkin, Martin)
April 23, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16950684. (Louise McAlpin) (Durkin, Martin)
April 23, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16950634. (Allison Kernisky) (Durkin, Martin)
April 23, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Camille I. Farhat, RTI Surgical Holdings, Inc., Jonathon M. Singer by Martin G. Durkin (Durkin, Martin)
April 23, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Johannes W. Louw by Elizabeth Ann Austermuehle (Austermuehle, Elizabeth)
April 23, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Johannes W. Louw by Vivek Jayaram (Jayaram, Vivek)
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motions of Russell Koonin and Adam Schwartz to appear pro hac vice #5 #6 are granted. (mk)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Johannes W. Louw re MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16947700. #5 , MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16947827. #6 Notice of Designation of Local Counsel (Koonin, Russell)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16947827. (Schwartz, Adam)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16947700. (Koonin, Russell)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket4, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patricia Lowry by Louis Carey Ludwig (Ludwig, Louis)
March 25, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Camille I. Farhat, Brian K. Hutchison, Robert P. Jordheim, Johannes W. Louw, RTI Surgical Holdings, Inc., Jonathon M. Singer (tg, )
March 24, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lw, )
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ludwig, Louis)
March 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS filed by Patricia Lowry; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16870703. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certification)(Ludwig, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowry et al v. RTI Surgical Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert P. Jordheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johannes W. Louw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathon M. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian K. Hutchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Lowry
Represented By: Louis Carey Ludwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camille I. Farhat
Represented By: Martin G. Durkin
Represented By: Louise McAlpin
Represented By: Allison Kernisky
Represented By: Stephen P Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTI Surgical Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Martin G. Durkin
Represented By: Louise McAlpin
Represented By: Allison Kernisky
Represented By: Stephen P Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?