Ayiomamitis v. AthenaVisual, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anthony Ayiomamitis
Defendant: AthenaVisual, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01965
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Filing 14 MAILED Copyright report with certified copy of minute order dated 5/5/2020 to Registrar, Washington DC (lma, )
May 5, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: A notice of voluntary dismissal has been filed. This case is dismissed with prejudice. Civil case terminated. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
May 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Anthony Ayiomamitis (Wirth, Craig)
May 4, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Anthony Ayiomamitis by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling)
April 28, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's Motion for settlement #8 is granted. Plaintiff is given until 5/26/20 to file a notice of voluntary dismissal. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Anthony Ayiomamitis for settlement (Rothman, Joel)
April 21, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Ayiomamitis as to AthenaVisual, Inc. on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. (Rothman, Joel)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket1, )
March 30, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant AthenaVisual, Inc. (tg, )
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Anthony Ayiomamitis by Joel Benjamin Rothman (Rothman, Joel)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pj, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (pj, )
March 25, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lw, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Wirth, Craig)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT (INJUNCTIVE RELIEF DEMANDED) filed by Anthony Ayiomamitis; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16874990. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2- Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 AO Form 121)(Wirth, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayiomamitis v. AthenaVisual, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AthenaVisual, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ayiomamitis
Represented By: Craig Anthony Wirth
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Represented By: Yanling Jiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?