Marino v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Robert Marino
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01981
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:By 6/15/2020 the parties are to file a joint status report as outlined in Judge Pallmeyer's Third Amended General Order 20-0012.Mailed notice (srn, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Robert Marino by Gregory F Coleman (Coleman, Gregory)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket6, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 17 MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to to all counsel of record. (bg, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 16 RECEIVED from Massachusetts; Case Number 1:20-cv-10048 (bg)
March 16, 2020 Filing 15 Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois;. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to Clerk in that district. (Montes, Mariliz) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/26/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 14 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. ORDER OF TRANSFER.(Montes, Mariliz) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/26/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 13 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404. (Montes, Mariliz) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/26/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Illinois. filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation)(Lantry, Jacob) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/26/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Illinois. by Ford Motor Company.(Lantry, Jacob) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/26/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob J. Lantry on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Lantry, Jacob) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/26/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John R. Fabry. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/26/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jose Luis Munoz. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/26/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John R. Fabry Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8083562 by Robert Marino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Straus, Alex) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/26/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jose Luis Munoz Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8083218 by Robert Marino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Munoz PHV Motion, #2 Exhibit B_Munoz PHV App.)(Straus, Alex) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/26/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Marino. Ford Motor Company waiver sent on 1/21/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Straus, Alex) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/26/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 4 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 4/13/2020. (Montes, Mariliz) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/26/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/26/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/26/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8049584 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Robert Marino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Summons to Ford Motor Company)(Straus, Alex) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 3/26/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marino v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Marino
Represented By: Jose Luis Munoz
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Represented By: Alex R. Straus
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Jacob J. Lantry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?