Big Onion Tavern Group, LLC et al v. Society Insurance, Inc.
Plaintiff: Headquarters Beercade LLC, Happy Camper Pizzeria LLC, Welcome Back LLC, Machine 1846 LLC, Legacy Hospitality LLC, Mcbride's Pub Inc., Harper Theater LLC, 1913 Northco LLC, Mcbrides Aurora Inc., Mcbride's On 52 Inc., The New 400 LLC, Big Onion Tavern Group, LLC, 3458 Norclark Restaurant LLC, Homeslyce Is Where The Heart Is LLC, Village Squire South Inc., The Barrelman Tavern Inc., Alexanders Restaurant Inc., 2450 N Milwaukee LLC, 3471 N Elston Inc., TS2 Inc., Gountanis Enterprises, Inc., Harlen-Rascals, Inc., Double K & A Sports Inc., BK & MM Ventures LLC, Calm & Chaos LLC, 806 W Randolph LLC, YMPV Inc., Exit Plan Holdings LLC, The Burger Philosophy LLC, Sancerre Hospitality I LLC, Village Squire North Inc., 108 Kinzie LLC, Village Squire of McHenry Inc., Wells 1525 LLC, 1270 Storefront LLC, Queen Mary LLC, Niche Restaurant Group LLC, Olmar Corp Inc., Ovie Bar & Grill LLC, Munster Taverns, Inc., Woodfire Brick Oven Pizza LLC, Triple K & A Sports Bar Inc., Rookies 5-Roselle Inc., 540 W Madison Hospitality LLC, OR1 Inc., Village Squire Inc., Clark 5260 LLC, Rambuttan LLC, Tai's Lounge Inc., A Pitzalla Blues LLC, Alexanders Caf 64 Inc., All Day Broadway LLC, 3478 N Clark Street Inc, Andersonville 5310 LLC, Roberta Nowakowski Inc. and JDS 1455, Inc. d/b/a West On North
Defendant: Society Insurance, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02005
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Filing 85 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On review of the parties' status report concerning the proposed MDL, the answer deadline remains at 07/13/2020, and this case will move forward. With regard to the status hearing of 06/11/2020, there is no need to file the joint initial status report in advance, given the answer deadline. Instead, the 06/11/2020 status hearing remains on the schedule in light of the Local Rule 40.4 reassignment motion. But it is likely that the status hearing will be continued after reviewing the briefs on that motion. If held, the status hearing will be held telephonically. The parties shall provide a contact number to the courtroom deputy (Michael_Wing@ilnd.uscourts.gov) by 1 p.m. on the prior business day. Emailed notice (Chang, Edmond)
May 18, 2020 Filing 84 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by 108 Kinzie LLC, 1270 Storefront LLC, 1913 Northco LLC, 2450 N Milwaukee LLC, 3458 Norclark Restaurant LLC, 3471 N Elston Inc., 3478 N Clark Street Inc, 540 W Madison Hospitality LLC, 806 W Randolph LLC, A Pitzalla Blues LLC, Alexanders Caf 64 Inc., Alexanders Restaurant Inc., All Day Broadway LLC, Andersonville 5310 LLC, BK & MM Ventures LLC, Big Onion Tavern Group, LLC, Calm & Chaos LLC, Clark 5260 LLC, Double K & A Sports Inc., Exit Plan Holdings LLC, Gountanis Enterprises, Inc., Happy Camper Pizzeria LLC, Harlen-Rascals, Inc., Harper Theater LLC, Headquarters Beercade LLC, Homeslyce Is Where The Heart Is LLC, JDS 1455, Inc. d/b/a West On North, Legacy Hospitality LLC, Machine 1846 LLC, Mcbride's On 52 Inc., Mcbride's Pub Inc., Mcbrides Aurora Inc., Munster Taverns, Inc., Niche Restaurant Group LLC, OR1 Inc., Olmar Corp Inc., Ovie Bar & Grill LLC, Queen Mary LLC, Rambuttan LLC, Roberta Nowakowski Inc., Rookies 5-Roselle Inc., Sancerre Hospitality I LLC, TS2 Inc., Tai's Lounge Inc., The Barrelman Tavern Inc., The Burger Philosophy LLC, The New 400 LLC, Triple K & A Sports Bar Inc., Village Squire Inc., Village Squire North Inc., Village Squire South Inc., Village Squire of McHenry Inc., Welcome Back LLC, Wells 1525 LLC, Woodfire Brick Oven Pizza LLC, YMPV Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Plaintiffs' Brief in Opp. to MDL Consolidation)(O'Malley, Christopher)
May 18, 2020 Filing 83 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff JDS 1455, Inc. d/b/a West On North by John Paul Bjork (Bjork, John)
May 18, 2020 Filing 82 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff JDS 1455, Inc. d/b/a West On North by Joseph Michael Vanek (Vanek, Joseph)
May 18, 2020 Filing 81 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On the motion to reassign #79 , filed by the plaintiff in JDS 1455, Inc. dba West by North v. Society Ins., 20-cv-02546 (Pallmeyer, J.), the parties in this case shall file a response by 06/01/2020. West by North may file a reply by 06/08/2020. For now, however, the Court denies in part, without prejudice, the reassignment motion as to the other cases labelled as the "Related Actions" (of course other than the one already assigned to Judge Chang). It is not at all clear that a non-party may invoke Local Rule 40.4 in this way. Local Rule 40.4(c) says that the motion "may be filed by any party to a case." The term "a case" obviously cannot mean "any" case pending in this District, and instead the rule implies that "a case" means the one that is sought to be reassigned, which would mean that only a party to that case can seek the reassignment. More practically, before burdening the parties in several other cases with potentially unnecessary briefing, it would be better to consider 20-cv-02546 first, as well as to consider the MDL-related status report to be filed by the parties in this case. Mailed notice (mw, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE of Motion by Joseph Michael Vanek for presentment of motion to reassign case,, #79 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/21/2020 at 08:30 AM. (Vanek, Joseph)
May 15, 2020 Filing 79 MOTION by Plaintiff JDS 1455, Inc. d/b/a West On North to reassign case as related (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Reassign Cases as Related, #2 Exhibit A - Billy Goat Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Biscuit Cafe Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Dunlay's Complaint, #5 Exhibit D - JDS Complaint, #6 Exhibit E - Kingsbury Complaint, #7 Exhibit F - Roscoe Complaint, #8 Exhibit G - Kedzie Complaint, #9 Exhibit H - Valley Lodge Complaint)(Vanek, Joseph)
May 15, 2020 Filing 78 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by 2450 N Milwaukee LLC, A Pitzalla Blues LLC, Olmar Corp Inc., Legacy Hospitality LLC, Munster Taverns, Inc., Village Squire South Inc., Headquarters Beercade LLC, Big Onion Tavern Group, LLC, Village Squire of McHenry Inc., 1270 Storefront LLC, 3471 N Elston Inc., Wells 1525 LLC, Andersonville 5310 LLC, Triple K & A Sports Bar Inc., Mcbride's On 52 Inc., Tai's Lounge Inc., Woodfire Brick Oven Pizza LLC, Exit Plan Holdings LLC, BK & MM Ventures LLC, YMPV Inc., 806 W Randolph LLC, 3458 Norclark Restaurant LLC, Calm & Chaos LLC, All Day Broadway LLC, Village Squire Inc., Alexanders Restaurant Inc., Clark 5260 LLC, Happy Camper Pizzeria LLC, Alexanders Caf 64 Inc., 540 W Madison Hospitality LLC, Sancerre Hospitality I LLC, Harlen-Rascals, Inc., The Burger Philosophy LLC, Mcbride's Pub Inc., Queen Mary LLC, Welcome Back LLC, The Barrelman Tavern Inc., TS2 Inc., Rookies 5-Roselle Inc., Roberta Nowakowski Inc., Village Squire North Inc., Machine 1846 LLC, Double K & A Sports Inc., OR1 Inc., Homeslyce Is Where The Heart Is LLC, 1913 Northco LLC, Rambuttan LLC, Mcbrides Aurora Inc., Niche Restaurant Group LLC, The New 400 LLC, Ovie Bar & Grill LLC, 108 Kinzie LLC, Gountanis Enterprises, Inc., 3478 N Clark Street Inc, Harper Theater LLC. Society Insurance, Inc. waiver sent on 5/14/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (O'Malley, Christopher)
May 14, 2020 Filing 77 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs 108 Kinzie LLC, 1270 Storefront LLC, 1913 Northco LLC, 2450 N Milwaukee LLC, 3458 Norclark Restaurant LLC, 3471 N Elston Inc., 3478 N Clark Street Inc, 540 W Madison Hospitality LLC, 806 W Randolph LLC, A Pitzalla Blues LLC, Alexanders Caf 64 Inc., Alexanders Restaurant Inc., All Day Broadway LLC, Andersonville 5310 LLC, BK & MM Ventures LLC, Big Onion Tavern Group, LLC, Calm & Chaos LLC, Clark 5260 LLC, Double K & A Sports Inc., Exit Plan Holdings LLC, Gountanis Enterprises, Inc., Happy Camper Pizzeria LLC, Harlen-Rascals, Inc., Harper Theater LLC, Headquarters Beercade LLC, Homeslyce Is Where The Heart Is LLC, Legacy Hospitality LLC, Machine 1846 LLC, Mcbride's On 52 Inc., Mcbride's Pub Inc., Mcbrides Aurora Inc., Munster Taverns, Inc., Niche Restaurant Group LLC, OR1 Inc., Olmar Corp Inc., Ovie Bar & Grill LLC, Queen Mary LLC, Rambuttan LLC, Roberta Nowakowski Inc., Rookies 5-Roselle Inc., Sancerre Hospitality I LLC, TS2 Inc., Tai's Lounge Inc., The Barrelman Tavern Inc., The Burger Philosophy LLC, The New 400 LLC, Triple K & A Sports Bar Inc., Village Squire Inc., Village Squire North Inc., Village Squire South Inc., Village Squire of McHenry Inc., Welcome Back LLC, Wells 1525 LLC, Woodfire Brick Oven Pizza LLC, YMPV Inc. by Livia McCammon Kiser (Kiser, Livia)
May 14, 2020 Filing 76 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs 108 Kinzie LLC, 1270 Storefront LLC, 1913 Northco LLC, 2450 N Milwaukee LLC, 3458 Norclark Restaurant LLC, 3471 N Elston Inc., 3478 N Clark Street Inc, 540 W Madison Hospitality LLC, 806 W Randolph LLC, A Pitzalla Blues LLC, Alexanders Caf 64 Inc., Alexanders Restaurant Inc., All Day Broadway LLC, Andersonville 5310 LLC, BK & MM Ventures LLC, Big Onion Tavern Group, LLC, Calm & Chaos LLC, Clark 5260 LLC, Double K & A Sports Inc., Exit Plan Holdings LLC, Gountanis Enterprises, Inc., Happy Camper Pizzeria LLC, Harlen-Rascals, Inc., Harper Theater LLC, Headquarters Beercade LLC, Homeslyce Is Where The Heart Is LLC, Legacy Hospitality LLC, Machine 1846 LLC, Mcbride's On 52 Inc., Mcbride's Pub Inc., Mcbrides Aurora Inc., Munster Taverns, Inc., Niche Restaurant Group LLC, OR1 Inc., Olmar Corp Inc., Ovie Bar & Grill LLC, Queen Mary LLC, Rambuttan LLC, Roberta Nowakowski Inc., Rookies 5-Roselle Inc., Sancerre Hospitality I LLC, TS2 Inc., Tai's Lounge Inc., The Barrelman Tavern Inc., The Burger Philosophy LLC, The New 400 LLC, Triple K & A Sports Bar Inc., Village Squire Inc., Village Squire North Inc., Village Squire South Inc., Village Squire of McHenry Inc., Welcome Back LLC, Wells 1525 LLC, Woodfire Brick Oven Pizza LLC, YMPV Inc. by Christopher J. O'Malley (O'Malley, Christopher)
May 14, 2020 Filing 75 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs 108 Kinzie LLC, 1270 Storefront LLC, 1913 Northco LLC, 2450 N Milwaukee LLC, 3458 Norclark Restaurant LLC, 3471 N Elston Inc., 3478 N Clark Street Inc, 540 W Madison Hospitality LLC, 806 W Randolph LLC, A Pitzalla Blues LLC, Alexanders Caf 64 Inc., Alexanders Restaurant Inc., All Day Broadway LLC, Andersonville 5310 LLC, BK & MM Ventures LLC, Big Onion Tavern Group, LLC, Calm & Chaos LLC, Clark 5260 LLC, Double K & A Sports Inc., Exit Plan Holdings LLC, Gountanis Enterprises, Inc., Happy Camper Pizzeria LLC, Harlen-Rascals, Inc., Harper Theater LLC, Headquarters Beercade LLC, Homeslyce Is Where The Heart Is LLC, Legacy Hospitality LLC, Machine 1846 LLC, Mcbride's On 52 Inc., Mcbride's Pub Inc., Mcbrides Aurora Inc., Munster Taverns, Inc., Niche Restaurant Group LLC, OR1 Inc., Olmar Corp Inc., Ovie Bar & Grill LLC, Queen Mary LLC, Rambuttan LLC, Roberta Nowakowski Inc., Rookies 5-Roselle Inc., Sancerre Hospitality I LLC, TS2 Inc., Tai's Lounge Inc., The Barrelman Tavern Inc., The Burger Philosophy LLC, The New 400 LLC, Triple K & A Sports Bar Inc., Village Squire Inc., Village Squire North Inc., Village Squire South Inc., Village Squire of McHenry Inc., Welcome Back LLC, Wells 1525 LLC, Woodfire Brick Oven Pizza LLC, YMPV Inc. by Andrew Jacob Chinsky (Chinsky, Andrew)
May 11, 2020 Filing 74 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Society Insurance, Inc. by Michelle Anne Miner (Miner, Michelle)
May 11, 2020 Filing 73 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Society Insurance, Inc. by Amy Elizabeth Chesshir Frantz (Chesshir Frantz, Amy)
May 11, 2020 Filing 72 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Society Insurance, Inc. by Michael Duane Sanders (Sanders, Michael)
May 11, 2020 Filing 71 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Society Insurance, Inc. by Thomas B. Underwood (Underwood, Thomas)
May 8, 2020 Filing 70 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by YMPV Inc. (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 69 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Woodfire Brick Oven Pizza LLC (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 68 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Wells 1525 LLC (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 67 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Village Squire South Inc. (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 66 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Village Squire of McHenry Inc. (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 65 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Village Squire North Inc. (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 64 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Village Squire Inc. (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 63 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TS2 Inc. (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 62 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Triple K & A Sports Bar Inc. (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 61 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Burger Philosophy LLC (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 60 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Barrelman Tavern Inc. (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 59 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Tai's Lounge Inc. (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 58 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Sancerre Hospitality I LLC (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 57 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Rookies 5-Roselle Inc. (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 56 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Roberta Nowakowski Inc. (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 55 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Rambuttan LLC (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 54 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Queen Mary LLC (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 53 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Ovie Bar & Grill LLC (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 52 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by OR1 Inc. (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 51 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Olmar Corp Inc. (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 50 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Niche Restaurant Group LLC (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 49 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Munster Taverns, Inc. (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 48 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Harlen-Rascals, Inc. (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 47 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Gountanis Enterprises, Inc. (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 46 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Exit Plan Holdings LLC (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 45 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Double K & A Sports Inc. (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 44 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Clark 5260 LLC (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 43 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Calm & Chaos LLC (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 42 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by BK & MM Ventures LLC (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 41 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Andersonville 5310 LLC (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 40 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Day Broadway LLC (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 39 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Alexanders Restaurant Inc. (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 38 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Alexanders Caf 64 Inc. (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 37 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by A Pitzalla Blues LLC (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 36 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by 3478 N Clark Street Inc (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 35 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by 3471 N Elston Inc. (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 34 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by 2450 N Milwaukee LLC (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 33 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by 1270 Storefront LLC (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 32 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by 806 W Randolph LLC (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 31 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by 540 W Madison Hospitality LLC (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 30 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by 108 Kinzie LLC (Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 29 First AMENDED complaint by Legacy Hospitality LLC, Headquarters Beercade LLC, Big Onion Tavern Group, LLC, Mcbride's On 52 Inc., 3458 Norclark Restaurant LLC, Happy Camper Pizzeria LLC, Mcbride's Pub Inc., Welcome Back LLC, Machine 1846 LLC, Homeslyce Is Where The Heart Is LLC, 1913 Northco LLC, Mcbrides Aurora Inc., The New 400 LLC, Harper Theater LLC, Sancerre Hospitality I LLC, Roberta Nowakowski Inc., 3471 N Elston Inc., 2450 N Milwaukee LLC, Munster Taverns, Inc., Alexanders Restaurant Inc., Queen Mary LLC, Triple K & A Sports Bar Inc., Niche Restaurant Group LLC, Olmar Corp Inc., 1270 Storefront LLC, Harlen-Rascals, Inc., BK & MM Ventures LLC, Wells 1525 LLC, TS2 Inc., 806 W Randolph LLC, Rambuttan LLC, Clark 5260 LLC, The Burger Philosophy LLC, The Barrelman Tavern Inc., Andersonville 5310 LLC, Tai's Lounge Inc., A Pitzalla Blues LLC, 540 W Madison Hospitality LLC, 108 Kinzie LLC, Gountanis Enterprises, Inc., Ovie Bar & Grill LLC, Calm & Chaos LLC, YMPV Inc., Village Squire of McHenry Inc., Alexanders Caf 64 Inc., Double K & A Sports Inc., Village Squire North Inc., All Day Broadway LLC, Village Squire Inc., Woodfire Brick Oven Pizza LLC, Village Squire South Inc., 3478 N Clark Street Inc, Rookies 5-Roselle Inc., OR1 Inc., Exit Plan Holdings LLC against Society Insurance, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A, #2 Exhibit - B, #3 Exhibit - C, #4 Exhibit - D)(Collins, Patrick)
May 8, 2020 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of the MDL transfer motions, it seems sensible to suspend the answer or response deadline in this case. The parties shall file a status report on that issue by 05/18/2020. Plaintiffs shall provide a copy of this order to defense counsel (at least to the attorney who waived service, R. 22), who should promptly file an appearance. Emailed notice (mw, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 27 SUBSEQUENT MOTION for Transfer of Actions Pursuant to 28 USC Section 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings (Exhibits). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(td, )
May 5, 2020 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs 1913 Northco LLC, 3458 Norclark Restaurant LLC, Big Onion Tavern Group, LLC, Happy Camper Pizzeria LLC, Harper Theater LLC, Headquarters Beercade LLC, Homeslyce Is Where The Heart Is LLC, Legacy Hospitality LLC, Machine 1846 LLC, Mcbride's On 52 Inc., Mcbride's Pub Inc., Mcbrides Aurora Inc., The New 400 LLC, Welcome Back LLC by Livia McCammon Kiser (Kiser, Livia)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Transfer and Coordination or Consolidation under 28 USC Section 1407 (Exhibits). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(td, )
April 13, 2020 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of the 06/09/2020 answer deadline, the initial status hearing of 05/28/2020 is reset to 06/11/2020 at 9:00 a.m., with the joint status report due on 06/09/2020. Mailed notice (mw, )
April 13, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Welcome Back LLC, Happy Camper Pizzeria LLC, Machine 1846 LLC, Legacy Hospitality LLC, Homeslyce Is Where The Heart Is LLC, Headquarters Beercade LLC, 1913 Northco LLC, Mcbride's On 52 Inc., Mcbrides Aurora Inc., The New 400 LLC, Big Onion Tavern Group, LLC, Mcbride's Pub Inc., 3458 Norclark Restaurant LLC, Harper Theater LLC. Society Insurance, Inc. waiver sent on 4/10/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. (Collins, Patrick)
April 10, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 05/28/2020 at 9:00 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Mailed notice (mw, )
March 31, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Society Insurance, Inc. (ec, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket5, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pj, )
March 27, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lw, )
March 27, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs 1913 Northco LLC, 3458 Norclark Restaurant LLC, Big Onion Tavern Group, LLC, Happy Camper Pizzeria LLC, Harper Theater LLC, Headquarters Beercade LLC, Homeslyce Is Where The Heart Is LLC, Legacy Hospitality LLC, Machine 1846 LLC, Mcbride's On 52 Inc., Mcbride's Pub Inc., Mcbrides Aurora Inc., The New 400 LLC, Welcome Back LLC by Christopher J. O'Malley (O'Malley, Christopher)
March 27, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs 1913 Northco LLC, 3458 Norclark Restaurant LLC, Big Onion Tavern Group, LLC, Happy Camper Pizzeria LLC, Harper Theater LLC, Headquarters Beercade LLC, Homeslyce Is Where The Heart Is LLC, Legacy Hospitality LLC, Machine 1846 LLC, Mcbride's On 52 Inc., Mcbride's Pub Inc., Mcbrides Aurora Inc., The New 400 LLC, Welcome Back LLC by Patrick M. Collins (Collins, Patrick)
March 27, 2020 Filing 16 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Welcome Back LLC (Collins, Patrick)
March 27, 2020 Filing 15 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The New 400 LLC (Collins, Patrick)
March 27, 2020 Filing 14 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Mcbride's Pub Inc. (Collins, Patrick)
March 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Mcbride's On 52 Inc. (Collins, Patrick)
March 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Mcbrides Aurora Inc. (Collins, Patrick)
March 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Machine 1846 LLC (Collins, Patrick)
March 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Legacy Hospitality LLC (Collins, Patrick)
March 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Homeslyce Is Where The Heart Is LLC (Collins, Patrick)
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Headquarters Beercade LLC (Collins, Patrick)
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Harper Theater LLC (Collins, Patrick)
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Happy Camper Pizzeria LLC (Collins, Patrick)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Big Onion Tavern Group, LLC (Collins, Patrick)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by 3458 Norclark Restaurant LLC (Collins, Patrick)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by 1913 Northco LLC (Collins, Patrick)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Collins, Patrick)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Welcome Back LLC, Happy Camper Pizzeria LLC, Machine 1846 LLC, Legacy Hospitality LLC, Homeslyce Is Where The Heart Is LLC, Headquarters Beercade LLC, 1913 Northco LLC, Mcbride's On 52 Inc., Mcbrides Aurora Inc., The New 400 LLC, Big Onion Tavern Group, LLC, Mcbride's Pub Inc., 3458 Norclark Restaurant LLC, Harper Theater LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16879728. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A, #2 Exhibit - B, #3 Exhibit - C)(Collins, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Big Onion Tavern Group, LLC et al v. Society Insurance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Headquarters Beercade LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Happy Camper Pizzeria LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welcome Back LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Machine 1846 LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Legacy Hospitality LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mcbride's Pub Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harper Theater LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1913 Northco LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mcbrides Aurora Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mcbride's On 52 Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The New 400 LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Onion Tavern Group, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3458 Norclark Restaurant LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homeslyce Is Where The Heart Is LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village Squire South Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Barrelman Tavern Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexanders Restaurant Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2450 N Milwaukee LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3471 N Elston Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TS2 Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gountanis Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harlen-Rascals, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Double K & A Sports Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BK & MM Ventures LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calm & Chaos LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 806 W Randolph LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YMPV Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exit Plan Holdings LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Burger Philosophy LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sancerre Hospitality I LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village Squire North Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 108 Kinzie LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village Squire of McHenry Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells 1525 LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1270 Storefront LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Queen Mary LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niche Restaurant Group LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olmar Corp Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ovie Bar & Grill LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Munster Taverns, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woodfire Brick Oven Pizza LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triple K & A Sports Bar Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rookies 5-Roselle Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 540 W Madison Hospitality LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OR1 Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village Squire Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clark 5260 LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rambuttan LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tai's Lounge Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A Pitzalla Blues LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexanders Caf 64 Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Day Broadway LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3478 N Clark Street Inc
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andersonville 5310 LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Nowakowski Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. O'Malley
Represented By: Patrick M. Collins
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Chinsky
Represented By: Livia McCammon Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JDS 1455, Inc. d/b/a West On North
Represented By: Joseph Michael Vanek
Represented By: John Paul Bjork
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Society Insurance, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Duane Sanders
Represented By: Thomas B. Underwood
Represented By: Michelle Anne Miner
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Chesshir Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?