Juana Aurora Cutino Alfaro v. Aerolineas Damojh, S.A. de C.V., et al
Plaintiff: Juana Aurora Cutino Alfaro, Special Administrator of the Estates of Carlos Miguel de la Cruz Cutino, Deceased, and Grettel Isel de la Cruz Cutino, Deceased,, Eddy Rodriguez Figueira, Elba Buitrago Cabrera, Samuel Oliva, Susell Buitrago Santiesteban, Guadalupe Espinosa Sanchez, Juana Aurora Cutino Alfaro, Eddie Rodriguez Tiqueira, Jose Alejandro Herna Ricardo and Anamary Font Granado
Defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY, a corporation, AEROLINEAS DAMOJH, S.A. de C.V., a foreign corporation, d/b/a GLOBAL AIR, Pan Am International Flight Academy, Aerolineas Damojh, S. A. de C.V., Global One Training Group LLC, Meigas Aviation 23180 Inc., The Boeing Company, Wells Fargo Trust Company, N.A. f/k/a Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, N.A., Meigas Aviation Services Ltd and Meigas Aviation Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02141
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Referring Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
May 17, 2020 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Juana Aurora Cutino Alfaro, Susell Buitrago Santiesteban, Elba Buitrago Cabrera, Guadalupe Espinosa Sanchez, Anamary Font Granado, Samuel Oliva, Jose Alejandro Herna Ricardo, Eddy Rodriguez Figueira, Eddie Rodriguez Tiqueira by Austin William Bartlett (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 17, 2020 Filing 23 Third AMENDED complaint by Eddie Rodriguez Tiqueira, Jose Alejandro Herna Ricardo, Juana Aurora Cutino Alfaro, Elba Buitrago Cabrera, Anamary Font Granado, Susell Buitrago Santiesteban, Eddy Rodriguez Figueira, Guadalupe Espinosa Sanchez, Samuel Oliva against All Defendants (Bartlett, Austin)
May 16, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Plaintiffs' emergency motion (filed on the docket in Case No. 19-cv-02552) for leave to file the amended complaint is granted. The pleading is deemed to be filed, but Plaintiffs shall promptly file it on this docket as a separate docket entry for clarity's sake. Boeing's answer is due by 06/15/2020. Aerolineas's answer deadline is suspended for now in light of the jurisdictional issue.Emailed notice (Chang, Edmond)
May 16, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Attorney James Neale's motion to appear pro hac vice #18 is granted.Emailed notice (Chang, Edmond)
May 16, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE by Defendant The Boeing Company to text entry,, #19 of No Opposition (Neale, James)
May 15, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On the docket of related Case No. 19-cv-02552, Plaintiffs have filed an emergency motion that applies to this case too. On review of that motion, it seems that the request to file an amended complaint is appropriate given the early procedural posture of the case and given the interest in eliminating any statute of limitations concern. In any event, any defense objection must be filed by 12 p.m. tomorrow, 05/16/2020. Emailed notice (Chang, Edmond)
May 12, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17004676. (Neale, James)
May 8, 2020 Filing 17 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/8/2020: Mailed notice (mw, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Joint Motion for Entry of Proposed Agreed Confidentiality Order #14 is granted. Mailed notice (mw, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by The Boeing Company re MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company for protective order [Joint Motion for Entry of Proposed Agreed Confidentiality Order] #14 (Hamilton, Steven)
May 8, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant The Boeing Company for protective order [Joint Motion for Entry of Proposed Agreed Confidentiality Order] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hamilton, Steven)
May 5, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Juana Aurora Cutino Alfaro, Elba Buitrago Cabrera, Jose Alejandro Herna Ricardo, Eddie Rodriguez Tiqueira by Austin William Bartlett (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Plaintiffs, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bartlett, Austin)
May 4, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendant's unopposed motion to reassign is granted, but with an alteration on consolidation. First, the following cases are reassigned, pursuant to Local Rule 40.4, to the calendar of Judge Edmond Chang in light of the complete liability-issue overlap with Case No. 1:19-cv-02552: (1) Alfaro v Aerolineas Damjojh, S.A. de C.V., Case No. 1:20-cv-02141; (2) Cabrera v. Aerolineas Damjojh, S.A. de C.V., Case No. 1:20-cv-02144; (3) Ricardo v. Aerolineas Damjojh, S.A. de C.V., Case No. 1:20-cv-02148; and (4) Tiqueria v. Aerolineas Damjojh, S.A. de C.V., Case No. 1:20-cv-2151. Second, because those four cases actually have the exact same operative complaint, had already been consolidated in state court, and are represented by the same lawyers, only Case No. 20-cv-2141 will be an operative case. The Court will add the Plaintiffs in the -2144, -2148, and -2151 cases as Plaintiffs in No. 20-cv-2141 and then terminate -2144, -2148, and -2151; those Plaintiffs' counsel shall file appearances for those clients after they are added to the docket. That way no quadruple filings need be made in those three cases, nor requires the parties to monitor those extra dockets for filings that might affect them. None of this shall prejudice the Defendants or any plaintiff in any case, because this is **not** a decision on consolidation or separation of parties, issues, or anything else for hearing or trial purposes under Civil Rule 42(a), (b). After -2141 is reassigned to Judge Chang, the parties in that case shall file a status report on that docket, after conferring with Plaintiffs' counsel in 19-cv-2552, on how to catch-up -2141 to 19-cv-2552, and what applies (hopefully everything) from this case to -2141. Also, -2141 is set for a status hearing on 07/20/2020 at 9:15 a.m., to coincide with 19-cv-2552. But for both cases, the status hearing will be held telephonically. The parties shall provide a contact number to the courtroom deputy (Michael_Wing@ilnd.uscourts.gov) by 1:00 p.m. on the prior business day. Mailed notice (mw, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 11 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang for all further proceedings pursuant to Rule 40.4. Related case No. 19cv2552. Honorable Ronald A. Guzman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/1/20.(gcy, )
April 28, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: In lieu of an initial status hearing, the Court directs the parties to, within 45 days of the filing of the complaint or within 14 days of this order if the 45-day time period has already elapsed, confer to discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. The parties shall also discuss deadlines for Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures and a proposed discovery plan. A written initial status report and proposed discovery plan shall be filed within 7 days of conferring as provided herein. Plaintiff is responsible for initiating such a meeting, and all lead counsel for all parties are required to participate. Failure or refusal to participate in such a meeting or to cooperate in the preparation of the written report may constitute a basis for sanctions. The Court will thereafter issue an order setting a discovery schedule. Mailed notice (is, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by The Boeing Company(Hamilton, Steven)
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Juana Aurora Cutino Alfaro by Austin William Bartlett (Bartlett, Austin)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (gcy, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by THE BOEING COMPANY, a corporation (Hamilton, Steven)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hamilton, Steven)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant THE BOEING COMPANY, a corporation by Steven David Hamilton (Hamilton, Steven)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2018L009431) filed by THE BOEING COMPANY, a corporation Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16913249. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hamilton, Steven)
April 6, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juana Aurora Cutino Alfaro v. Aerolineas Damojh, S.A. de C.V., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY, a corporation
Represented By: Steven David Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEROLINEAS DAMOJH, S.A. de C.V., a foreign corporation, d/b/a GLOBAL AIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pan Am International Flight Academy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerolineas Damojh, S. A. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global One Training Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meigas Aviation 23180 Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Steven David Hamilton
Represented By: James F Neale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Trust Company, N.A. f/k/a Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meigas Aviation Services Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meigas Aviation Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Aurora Cutino Alfaro, Special Administrator of the Estates of Carlos Miguel de la Cruz Cutino, Deceased, and Grettel Isel de la Cruz Cutino, Deceased,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddy Rodriguez Figueira
Represented By: Austin William Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elba Buitrago Cabrera
Represented By: Austin William Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Oliva
Represented By: Austin William Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susell Buitrago Santiesteban
Represented By: Austin William Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Espinosa Sanchez
Represented By: Austin William Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Aurora Cutino Alfaro
Represented By: Austin William Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Rodriguez Tiqueira
Represented By: Austin William Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Alejandro Herna Ricardo
Represented By: Austin William Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anamary Font Granado
Represented By: Austin William Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?