Rudolph v. United Airlines Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Rudolph
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc. and United Airlines Holdings, Inc.
Petitioner: John Compo
Case Number: 1:2020cv02142
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER:Joint unopposed motion to consolidate and plaintiffs' request for an order regarding case leadership proposals and consolidated amended complaint timing is granted. #23 Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/28/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION by Movant John Compo, Plaintiff Jacob Rudolph to consolidate cases UNOPPOSED JOINT MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR ORDER REGARDING CASE LEADERSHIP PROPOSALS AND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT TIMING (Herrera, Daniel)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:By 7/1/2020 the parties are to file a joint status report as outlined in Judge Pallmeyer's Third Amended General Order 20-0012.Mailed notice (srn, )
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATION by Jacob Rudolph Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP's Certification Per Docket Entry No. 18 (Berman, Steve)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Attorney Lynn Moffa has entered an appearance on behalf of the defendants. Ms. Moffa served as a law clerk to Judge Durkin from July 2015 to January 2018. Although the Court does not believe this relationship is a basis for recusal, and is entering this order as a matter of disclosure, any party who wishes to raise this issue is free to do so. Mailed notice (srn, )
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Judge Durkin's niece, McKenzie Durkin, has completed her second year of law school at Loyola University Chicago, and is starting as a summer associate at the Chicago office of Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP, counsel for the Plaintiff in this case. It is the Court's understanding that she will perform no work on any case before this Court. Hagens Berman should make a filing affirming this fact. Although the Court does not believe this relationship is a basis for recusal, and is entering this order as a matter of disclosure, any party who wishes to raise this issue is free to do so.Mailed notice (srn, )
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Joint motion to reassign case based on relatedness #15 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 20 C 2166, pending before Judge Lefkow, be reassigned to this Court's calendar as related to this action. No appearance is required on 5/14/2020.Mailed notice (srn, )
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel O. Herrera for presentment of motion to reassign case #15 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/14/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Herrera, Daniel)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION by Movant John Compo to reassign case JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR A FINDING OF RELATEDNESS AND REASSIGNMENT (Herrera, Daniel)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants United Airlines Holdings, Inc., United Airlines, Inc. by Lynn Dee Moffa (Moffa, Lynn)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Defendants (Hemeryck, Sondra)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants United Airlines Holdings, Inc., United Airlines, Inc. by Sondra A. Hemeryck (Hemeryck, Sondra)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants United Airlines Holdings, Inc., United Airlines, Inc. by Patricia Brown Holmes (Holmes, Patricia)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Rudolph as to United Airlines, Inc. on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Berman, Steve)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Rudolph (Berman, Steve)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Rudolph as to United Airlines Holdings, Inc. on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Berman, Steve)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jacob Rudolph by Whitney Kendall Siehl (Siehl, Whitney)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jacob Rudolph by Daniel J. Kurowski (Kurowski, Daniel)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jacob Rudolph by Steve W. Berman (Berman, Steve)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint filed by Jacob Rudolph; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16913228. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berman, Steve)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants United Airlines Holdings, Inc., United Airlines, Inc. (ng, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rudolph v. United Airlines Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Lynn Dee Moffa
Represented By: Sondra A. Hemeryck
Represented By: Patricia Brown Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Lynn Dee Moffa
Represented By: Sondra A. Hemeryck
Represented By: Patricia Brown Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Rudolph
Represented By: Whitney Kendall Siehl
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Daniel J. Kurowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Compo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?