Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company et al v. Four Seasons Heating and Air Conditioning, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company and Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company
Defendant: Four Seasons Heating and Air Conditioning, Inc. and Kevin Truss
Case Number: 1:2020cv02146
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED complaint by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company against Four Seasons Heating and Air Conditioning, Inc., Kevin Truss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B.1, #3 Exhibit B.2, #4 Exhibit B.3, #5 Exhibit B.4, #6 Exhibit B.5, #7 Exhibit C)(Bloom, Matthew)
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company. Four Seasons Heating and Air Conditioning, Inc. waiver sent on 4/30/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Bloom, Matthew)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company. Kevin Truss waiver sent on 4/8/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Bloom, Matthew)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 8, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Four Seasons Heating and Air Conditioning, Inc. (ng, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pj, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 7.1 Disclosure by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company (Bloom, Matthew)
April 6, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bloom, Matthew)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company, Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16913546. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B.1, #3 Exhibit B.2, #4 Exhibit B.3, #5 Exhibit B.4, #6 Exhibit B.5, #7 Exhibit C)(Bloom, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company et al v. Four Seasons Heating and Air Conditioning, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Seasons Heating and Air Conditioning, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Truss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harleysville Preferred Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew R Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harleysville Worcester Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew R Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?