Ricardo v. Aerolineas Damojh, S.A. de C.V. et al
Plaintiff: JOSE ALEJANDRO HERNANDEZ RICARDO, individually and as Special Administrator of the Estate of NELSON HERNANDEZ RODRIGUEZ, deceased and Jose Alejandro Hernandez Ricardo
Defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY, a corporation, AEROLINEAS DAMOJH, S.A. de C.V., a foreign corporation, d/b/a GLOBAL AIR, Boeing Company, The and Aerolineas Damojh, S.A. de C.V.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02148
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Referring Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Only Case No. 20-cv-2141 will be the operative case. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (mw, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 12 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang for all further proceedings. Honorable Sara L. Ellis no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/1/2020.(tg, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Boeing Company, The(Hamilton, Steven)
April 17, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jose Alejandro Hernandez Ricardo by Austin William Bartlett (Bartlett, Austin)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 6/10/2020 at 9:30 AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 6/3/2020. Mailed notice (rj, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ecw, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (ecw, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by THE BOEING COMPANY, a corporation (Hamilton, Steven)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hamilton, Steven)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant THE BOEING COMPANY, a corporation by Steven David Hamilton (Hamilton, Steven)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2018L011245) filed by THE BOEING COMPANY, a corporation Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16913702. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hamilton, Steven)
April 6, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricardo v. Aerolineas Damojh, S.A. de C.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY, a corporation
Represented By: Steven David Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEROLINEAS DAMOJH, S.A. de C.V., a foreign corporation, d/b/a GLOBAL AIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company, The
Represented By: Steven David Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerolineas Damojh, S.A. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE ALEJANDRO HERNANDEZ RICARDO, individually and as Special Administrator of the Estate of NELSON HERNANDEZ RODRIGUEZ, deceased
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Alejandro Hernandez Ricardo
Represented By: Austin William Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?